Robert Walters v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Robert Walters
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2021cv08552
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, #14 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, Case No. 2:21-cv-08552-CAS-PDx, is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants with prejudice. All dates set in this matter are hereby vacated and taken off calendar. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs in this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ingram, Grant)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER REMOVING ACTION FROM THE ACTIVE LIST OF CASES, PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT, #12 . by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is hereby removed from this Courts active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a proper stipulation for dismissal or a joint report detailing settlement status within 60 days and every quarter thereafter until a stipulation for dismissal is filed. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. All dates in this action are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Robert Walters. (Bather, Phillip)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 12/24/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Grant E Ingram added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Ingram, Grant)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Walters, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, intake specialist of CT Corporation System Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-08552-CAS-PDx. (aco)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Robert Walters. (Bather, Phillip)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robert Walters. (Bather, Phillip)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Walters. (Bather, Phillip)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert Walters, (Bather, Phillip)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32237116 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Robert Walters. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Robert Walters(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Walters v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Walters
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grant E Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?