Siaka Massaquoi v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Plaintiff: Siaka Massaquoi
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), FBI Special Agent Chad Warren, Federal Bureau of Investigation and Chad Warren
Case Number: 2:2021cv08569
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 19 Mail Returned addressed to Siaka Massaquoi re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 11 (mrgo)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS #8 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. If plaintiff wishes, he must file an amended complaint by 2/1/2022; otherwise, the Court will dismiss the action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (See minute order for details) (mrgo)
December 1, 2021 Filing 15 Mail Returned addressed to Siaka Massaquoi re Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34), #9 (mrgo)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The Motion to Dismiss #8 is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 12/06/2021 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The scheduling conference previously scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 8:30 a.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 Mail Returned addressed to Siaka Massaquoi re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 (mrgo)
November 19, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Siaka Massaquoi, re Response in Support of Motion #16 served on 11/19/2021. (mrgo)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Plaintiff Siaka Massaquoi. (mrgo)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 - Hearing on the motion previously scheduled for 12/03/20 at 8:30 a.m. has been rescheduled to 12/6/2021 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-05722-SVW-PDx. Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08569-SVW-PDx. Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (aco)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Chad Warren. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Seidman, Talya)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference on 12/3/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. The parties shall file a joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/23/2021. (vcr)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Chad Warren, filed by Defendant Siaka Massaquoi. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Chad Warren. (Seidman, Talya)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Pasadena Courthouse, case number 21PDSC01643 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendants Chad Warren, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Chad Warren (pty:dft))(Seidman, Talya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siaka Massaquoi v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siaka Massaquoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI Special Agent Chad Warren
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Warren
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?