Vinson Hall v. Arseniy Dubnyakov
Plaintiff: Vinson Hall
Defendant: Arseniy Dubnyakov
Case Number: 2:2021cv08587
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 21-08 and Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF #26 appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for December 20, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2021 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall, re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 served on 11/19/2021. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 35 EXHIBITS 16-31 (ATTACHMENT) to JAMES LAUER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall as to Affidavit #30 . (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 34 EXHIBITS 16-31 (ATTACHMENT) to KEVIN REEVER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall as to Affidavit #32 . (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 33 EXHIBITS 16-31 (ATTACHMENT) to VINSON HALL'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall as to Affidavit #28 . (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 32 KEVIN REEVER AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 31 EXHIBITS 1-15 (ATTACHMENT) to JAMES LAUER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 30 JAMES LAUER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 29 EXHIBITS 1-15 (ATTACHMENT) to VINSON HALL'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 28 VINSON HALL'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 26 VINSON HALL'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (iv)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court has read and considered the papers filed in connection with the Second Application. Like the First Application, the Second Application is DENIED on both substantive and procedural grounds. (iv)
November 11, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 served on 11/11/2021. (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall, upon Defendant Arseniy Dubnyakov served on 11/9/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Arseniy Dubynakov in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 22 EXHIBITS 1-15 to KEVIN REEVER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF TRO AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall as to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 , Affidavit #17 . (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 21 EXHIBITS 1-15 to VINSON HALL'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF TRO AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall as to Affidavit #16 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 . (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 20 EXHIBITS 16-35 to JAMES LAUER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF TRO AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall as to Affidavit #18 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 . (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 19 EXHIBITS 1-15 to JAMES LAUER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF TRO AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall as to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 as to Affidavit #18 . (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 18 JAMES LAUER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF TRO AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 KEVIN REEVER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF TRO AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2021: #1 Exhibit) (iv).
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 VINSON HALL'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF TRO AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2021: #1 Exhibit) (iv).
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TRO AND OSC WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #14 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and OSC filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (iv)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #8 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On both substantive and procedural grounds, the Application is DENIED. (iv)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 JAMES LAUER'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #8 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall Modified on 11/3/2021 (iv).
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 KEVIN REEVERS AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #8 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 VINSON HALL'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #8 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #8 filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (iv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2021: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (iv).
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (iv)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Please see ORDER for full details. (smom)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Arseniy Dubnyakov. (car)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall (car)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, AND DAMAGES against Defendant Arseniy Dubnyakov. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles Eick.(Filing fee $ 402 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Vinson Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinson Hall v. Arseniy Dubnyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinson Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arseniy Dubnyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?