Benjamin OCampo Castro v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Benjamin O'Campo Castro and Benjamin OCampo Castro
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08596
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Benjamin OCampo Castro. (McCabe, Patricia)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin OCampo Castro, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 12/27/2021, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (McCabe, Patricia)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (In Chambers) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
October 30, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin O'Campo Castro. (McCabe, Patricia)
October 30, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Benjamin O'Campo Castro, (McCabe, Patricia)
October 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Benjamin O'Campo Castro. (McCabe, Patricia)
October 30, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Benjamin O'Campo Castro. (McCabe, Patricia)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Benjamin O'Campo Castro. (Attorney Patricia L McCabe added to party Benjamin O'Campo Castro(pty:pla))(McCabe, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin OCampo Castro v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin O'Campo Castro
Represented By: Patricia L McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin OCampo Castro
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Berk
Represented By: Patricia L McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?