Daniel John Mendoza v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Daniel John Mendoza
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08606
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-8606 SHK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Daniel John Mendoza. (Benavides, Francesco)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel John Mendoza, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/19/2021, answer due 2/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Not legible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Benavides, Francesco)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Dft Kilolo Kijakazi. (dc)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (dc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Daniel John Mendoza. (Benavides, Francesco)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel John Mendoza. (Benavides, Francesco)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel John Mendoza, (Benavides, Francesco)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Daniel John Mendoza. (Benavides, Francesco)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Daniel John Mendoza. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Daniel John Mendoza(pty:pla))(Benavides, Francesco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel John Mendoza v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel John Mendoza
Represented By: Francesco P Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?