Anand et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kulvinder Kaur Anand and Genes market Circle K
Defendant: United States of America and Tom Vilsack
Case Number: 2:2021cv08620
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H. Wu: The Court continues the status conference to 1/6/2022 at 8:30 AM. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on 1/4/2022.Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (jp)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE ON AN AGENCY OR CORPORATION OF THE UNITED STATES Executed by Plaintiff Kulvinder Kaur Anand, upon Defendant United States of America served on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Ortiz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to not indicated. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (bm)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to defendant Tom Vilsack. (mrgo)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - PRELIMINARY RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' INITIALLY-FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge George H. Wu re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay #4 . (Status Conference set for 12/27/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (See minute order for details) (mrgo)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 11/29/2021 Motion Hearing #4 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See attached document for details) (mrgo)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF DECLARATION in Support of Motion Summary of Judgement Relief from Disqualification and Stay of Execution re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION Stay of Disqualification Penalties Injunctive Relief FNs's Final Agency Decision #4 filed by Plaintiff Kulvinder Kaur Anand. (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiff Kulvinder Kaur Anand. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION Stay of Disqualification Penalties Injunctive Relief FNS's Final Agency Decision #4 (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION Stay of Disqualification Penalties Injunctive Relief FNS's Final Agency Decision, filed by Plaintiff Kulvinder Kaur Anand. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by Plaintiff Kulvinder Kaur Anand, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 served on 10/29/2021. (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by mail filed by Plaintiff Kulvinder Kaur Anand, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 served on 10/29/2021. (lh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants United States of America, Tom Vilsack. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish.(Filing Fee $402 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Kulvinder Kaur Anand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anand et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulvinder Kaur Anand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genes market Circle K
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?