Josue N. Rosales v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Josue N. Rosales
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08654
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-8654 GJS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Josue N. Rosales, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 12/3/2021, answer due 3/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Panutich, Alex)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Josue N. Rosales. (Panutich, Alex)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Lynn M Harada added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. [See document for details.] (es)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (es)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF Josue N. Rosales. (Panutich, Alex)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Josue N. Rosales, (Panutich, Alex)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Josue N. Rosales. (Panutich, Alex)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Josue N. Rosales. (Panutich, Alex)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF Josue N. Rosales. (Attorney Alex Panutich added to party Josue N. Rosales(pty:pla))(Panutich, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josue N. Rosales v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue N. Rosales
Represented By: Alex Panutich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Lynn M Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?