Lydia Anne Koch et al v. Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lydia Anne Koch and Julia Gorton
Defendant: Webster USA, Inc., Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC, Atallah Group US, Inc., Modesens, Inc. and DOES 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv08696
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Modesens, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Lydia Anne Koch; Julia Gorton.(Doniger, Stephen)
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading from December 8, 2021 to January 7, 2022 filed by Defendant Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC.(Attorney Alan R Kossoff added to party Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC(pty:dft))(Kossoff, Alan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lydia Anne Koch, Julia Gorton, upon Defendant Modesens, Inc. served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agents, Inc. c/o Britney Busby - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lydia Anne Koch, Julia Gorton, upon Defendant Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Businessrocket.net, Inc. c/o Donna Lynn Mendez - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lydia Anne Koch, Julia Gorton, upon Defendant Webster USA, Inc. served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lydia Anne Koch, Julia Gorton, upon Defendant Atallah Group US, Inc. served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gares\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Atallah Group US, Inc., Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC, Modesens, Inc., Webster USA, Inc. (car)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Julia Gorton, Lydia Anne Koch. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Julia Gorton, Lydia Anne Koch. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Julia Gorton, Lydia Anne Koch, (Doniger, Stephen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Julia Gorton, Lydia Anne Koch. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32268852 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Lydia Anne Koch, Julia Gorton. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Julia Gorton(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Lydia Anne Koch(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lydia Anne Koch et al v. Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Anne Koch
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Represented By: David Shein
Represented By: Scott A. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Gorton
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Represented By: David Shein
Represented By: Scott A. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enfants Riches Deprimes, LLC
Represented By: Alan R Kossoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atallah Group US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?