Alejandro Ramirez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ramirez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08772
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-8772 AGR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Margaret Branick-Abilla added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Branick-Abilla, Margaret)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Ramirez. (Perales, Monica)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alejandro Ramirez, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 12/6/2021, answer due 3/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of Regional Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Perales, Monica)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAS BEEN REVISED EFFECTIVE JANUARY 2016. PLEASE REVIEW THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. In accordance with General Order 05-01, this case is designated for electronic filing. A chambers copy is required only for the joint stipulation and the certified administrative record. In order to facilitate the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this case, the parties shall comply with the following instructions: (see document for further details). (hr)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Ramirez, (Perales, Monica)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Ramirez. (Perales, Monica)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Ramirez. (Perales, Monica)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Ramirez. (Perales, Monica)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Ramirez. (Attorney Monica Perales added to party Alejandro Ramirez(pty:pla))(Perales, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alejandro Ramirez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ramirez
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?