Kathyleen C. Gomez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kathyleen C. Gomez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08833
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-8833 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Gerrard, Josephine)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Margaret Branick-Abilla added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Branick-Abilla, Margaret)
November 28, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kathyleen C. Gomez, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/19/2021, answer due 2/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sese. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Processing Clerk SSA. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified Mail receipt)(Gerrard, Josephine)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. [Chambers courtesy copies are not required.] (dml)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (dml)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . (dml)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Kathyleen C. Gomez. correcting REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #5 conformed IFP (Gerrard, Josephine)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kathyleen Gomez. (Gerrard, Josephine)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kathyleen Gomez. (Gerrard, Josephine)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Kathyleen Gomez. (Attorney Josephine Mary Gerrard added to party Kathyleen Gomez(pty:pla))(Gerrard, Josephine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathyleen C. Gomez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathyleen C. Gomez
Represented By: Josephine Mary Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?