Lei Mei Chen v. Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Li Mei Chen
Defendant: Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu, Wu Development, LLC, Annie Wu and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08866
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Howard Wu. as to Howard Wu, Bankruptcy Court case number 2:21-bk-19480-ER. (Bensamochan, Eric)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On December 21, 2021, the Court issued an Order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #16 . On December 22, 2021, Plaintiff filed a Request for Clerk to Enter Default #17 . Default was subsequently entered. In light of this responsive filing, the Court hereby orders the OSC discharged. *Plaintiff shall file an appropriate Motion for Default Judgment no later than January 28, 2022.*THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 28, 2021 Filing 18 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendants Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC., Howard Wu, Taylor Woods, Wu Development, LLC. (jp)
December 22, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu, Wu Development, LLC filed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In support of Request for Entry of Default) (Lopez, Hugo)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FORLACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than December 29, 2021, why th is action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the abov e date: Answer to the Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41 ) See minute order for details. (lom)
November 29, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen, upon Defendant Wu Development, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Howard Wu - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lopez, Hugo)
November 29, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen, upon Defendant Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Howard Wu - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lopez, Hugo)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen, upon Defendant Howard Wu served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Howard Wu - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lopez, Hugo)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen, upon Defendant Taylor Woods served on 11/21/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Taylor Woods - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lopez, Hugo)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-01973 JLS(DFMx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08866 JLS(DFMx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Taylor Woods, Annie Wu, Howard Wu, Wu Development, LLC. (car)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen. (Lopez, Hugo)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen, (Lopez, Hugo)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen. (Lopez, Hugo)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 11/10/2021, receipt number 120465), filed by Plaintiff Li Mei Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Hugo Armando Lopez added to party Li Mei Chen(pty:pla))(Lopez, Hugo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lei Mei Chen v. Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Li Mei Chen
Represented By: Hugo Armando Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Blank
Represented By: Norma V. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wu Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?