Miramax, LLC v. Quentin Tarantino et al
Plaintiff: Miramax, LLC
Defendant: Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2021cv08979
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Williams, Bart)
September 1, 2022 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT Re: Settlement filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Williams, Bart)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER AMENDING THE SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL #38 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for February 10, 2023, at 10:00 a.m.; and The trial is scheduled to begin on February 28, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (iv)
August 8, 2022 Filing 38 STIPULATION to Amend filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Bart)
July 15, 2022 Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #29 , currently set for hearing on July 21, 2022, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 7, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #29 filed by Defendants Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jesse A. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kaplan, Jesse)
June 30, 2022 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #29 (MIRAMAX, LLC'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RELATED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE) filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Williams, Bart)
June 30, 2022 Filing 34 DECLARATION of KYLE A. CASAZZA IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #29 filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Casazza, Kyle)
June 30, 2022 Filing 33 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #29 filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Bart)
June 28, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/12/2022 (9:33 a.m. to 10:15 a.m.) re Transcript #31 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 28, 2022 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/12/2022 (9:33 a.m. to 10:15 a.m.). Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC.., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/19/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2022. (aa)
June 27, 2022 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Miramax, LLC for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Dennis McPeck at dmcpeck@proskauer.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Casazza, Kyle)
June 21, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendants Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Freedman, Bryan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 28 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (No. 25); ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL, Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting in part and denying in part #25 Motion to Compel. The Court adopted its attached tentative ruling (No. 27) as its final ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, granted in part and denied in part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as detailed therein, and ordered Defendants to produce the items called for by the Court's Order within fourteen (14) days. Court Recorder: CS 04/12/22. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (hr)
April 1, 2022 Filing 27 (In Chambers) NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re: MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #25 . (see document for details) (hr)
March 29, 2022 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents #25 Supplemental Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kyle a. Casazza in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents)(Williams, Bart)
March 21, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Williams, Bart)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order #23 . (see document for details) (hr)
March 10, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING filed by PLAINTIFF Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(Williams, Bart)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for February 10, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on February 28, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (iv)
February 10, 2022 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC.. (Williams, Bart)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/10/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
December 9, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc., identifying MIRAMAX, LLC, QUENTIN TARANTINO and VISIONA ROMANTICA, INC.. (Freedman, Bryan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND REQUEST filed by Defendant Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc..(Attorney Bryan J Freedman added to party Quentin Tarantino(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan J Freedman added to party Visiona Romantica, Inc.(pty:dft))(Freedman, Bryan)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Wai Choy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, designating Kyle Casazza as local counsel #7 . (iv)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Neuburger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, designating Kyle Casazza as local counsel #6 . (iv)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #10 served on November 18, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C)(Williams, Bart)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Visiona Romantica, Inc. (lh)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Quentin Tarantino. (lh)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wai L. Choy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32333727) filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Casazza, Kyle)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D. Neuburger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32333639) filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kyle Alexander Casazza added to party Miramax, LLC(pty:pla)) (Casazza, Kyle)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, (Williams, Bart)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC (Williams, Bart)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons for Defendant Visiona Romantica, Inc.)(Williams, Bart)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Williams, Bart)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32332555 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Bart H Williams added to party Miramax, LLC(pty:pla))(Williams, Bart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miramax, LLC v. Quentin Tarantino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miramax, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Alexander Casazza
Represented By: Bart H Williams
Represented By: Alyson Claire Tocicki
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Neuburger
Represented By: Seth Victor
Represented By: Wai L. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Tarantino
Represented By: Bryan J Freedman
Represented By: David Nimmer
Represented By: Dennis Joseph Courtney
Represented By: Jesse A Kaplan
Represented By: Theresa M Troupson
Represented By: Connor Reed He-Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visiona Romantica, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan J Freedman
Represented By: David Nimmer
Represented By: Dennis Joseph Courtney
Represented By: Jesse A Kaplan
Represented By: Theresa M Troupson
Represented By: Connor Reed He-Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?