Ailan Wang v. Alejandro N. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Ailan Wang
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and David M. Radel
Case Number: 2:2021cv09316
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ailan Wang, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 12/10/2021, answer due 2/8/2022; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 12/10/2021, answer due 2/8/2022; David M. Radel served on 12/10/2021, answer due 2/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit delivered confirmation, #2 Exhibit summons)(Wang, Justin)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Ailan Wang. (Wang, Justin)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, David M. Radel. (car)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11-C) (car)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ailan Wang, (Wang, Justin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ailan Wang. (Wang, Justin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ailan Wang. (Wang, Justin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32407703 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Ailan Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Justin X Wang added to party Ailan Wang(pty:pla))(Wang, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ailan Wang v. Alejandro N. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ailan Wang
Represented By: Justin X Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Radel
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?