Grace Johnson et al v. Gary Yeung et al
Plaintiff: Grace Johnson, Anthony G. Johnson, M.J. and J.J.
Defendant: Gary Yeung, Boeing Company Inc The, General Electric Company and GE Aviation Materials, Inc.
Petitioner: PAL Systems (U.S.) Holding Inc., Philippine Airlines Inc. and City Los Angeles World Airports
Case Number: 2:2021cv09421
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 36 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has received the parties joint status report (ECF No. #35 ). Based thereon, the Court continues the April 21, 2022 status conference to June 30, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status report by June 28. There will be no further continuances regarding pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 19, 2022 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants GE Aviation Materials, Inc., General Electric Company. (Reich, Adam)
April 18, 2022 Filing 34 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 04/21/2022 status conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 14, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel P Ridlon counsel for Defendant Boeing Company Inc The. Adding Daniel Ridlon as counsel of record for The Boeing Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant The Boeing Company. (Attorney Daniel P Ridlon added to party Boeing Company Inc The(pty:dft))(Ridlon, Daniel)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITION FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RELATING TO MINOR M.J. by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #28 APPLICATION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. IT IS HEREBY CONDITIONALLY ORDERED, subject to a later review by the assigned District Judge, that Grace Johnson be, and is, hereby appointed as guardian ad litem for M.J., a plaintiff in the above-entitled action, and is authorized to institute and prosecute the instant action. (hr)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITION FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RELATING TO MINOR J.J. by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #27 APPLICATION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. IT IS HEREBY CONDITIONALLY ORDERED, subject to a later review by the assigned District Judge, that Grace Johnson be, and is, hereby appointed as guardian ad litem for J.J., a plaintiff in the above-entitled action, and is authorized to institute and prosecute the instant action. (hr)
February 15, 2022 Filing 30 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint as to Defendants Boeing Company Inc The, City Los Angeles World Airports, GE Aviation Materials, Inc., General Electric Company, PAL Systems (U.S.) Holding Inc., Philippine Airlines Inc., Gary Yeung. (bm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 29 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs J.J., Anthony G. Johnson, Grace Johnson, M.J.. (Dufour, Michael)
February 15, 2022 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Appointment of as Guardian ad Litem for MJ filed by plaintiff M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dufour, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Appointment of Grace Johnson as Guardian ad Litem for JJ filed by plaintiff J.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dufour, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of interested parties filed by plaintiffs J.J., Anthony G. Johnson, Grace Johnson, M.J.. (Dufour, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery) filed by plaintiffs J.J., Anthony G. Johnson, Grace Johnson, M.J.. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2)(Dufour, Michael)
January 26, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Summons Request #20 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #18 , First APPLICATION for Appointment of Grace Johnson as Guardian ad Litem for MCJ #22 , First PETITION for Appointment of Grace Johnson as Guardian ad Litem for JJ #21 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #19 by Clerk of Court. Docket Numbers 18 - 22 are stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #23 filed on January 25, 2022. (mrgo)
January 25, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request #20 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #18 , First APPLICATION for Appointment of Grace Johnson as Guardian ad Litem for MCJ #22 , First PETITION for Appointment of Grace Johnson as Guardian ad Litem for JJ #21 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A Complaint was filed and the filing fee was paid; however, this case has already been assigned. All the documents filed on 1/24/22, reveal the full names of the minors instead of the initials. The Orders on the petitions shall be submitted as a separate attachment to each petition. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
January 24, 2022 Filing 22 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 24] First APPLICATION for Appointment of Grace Johnson as Guardian ad Litem for MCJ filed by plaintiff M.J.. (Dufour, Michael) Modified on 1/26/2022 (mrgo).
January 24, 2022 Filing 21 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 24] First PETITION for Appointment of Grace Johnson as Guardian ad Litem for JJ filed by plaintiff J.J.. (Dufour, Michael) Modified on 1/26/2022 (mrgo).
January 24, 2022 Filing 20 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 24] Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #18 filed by plaintiffs J.J., Anthony G. Johnson, Grace Johnson, M.J.. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2)(Dufour, Michael) Modified on 1/26/2022 (mrgo).
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 24] CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs J.J., Anthony G. Johnson, Grace Johnson, M.J.. (Dufour, Michael) Modified on 1/26/2022 (mrgo).
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 24] COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32668255 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs M.J., Anthony G. Johnson, Grace Johnson, J.J..(Dufour, Michael) Modified on 1/26/2022 (mrgo).
December 28, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 90 days from date of service of summons and complaint filed by Defendants Boeing Company Inc The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hussey, Julie)
December 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order attachment is a duplicate of the main attachment of the Stipulation. There is no proposed order attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation #14 is APPROVED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant The Boeing Company ("Boeing") will have 90 days from the date of service of the summons and complaint on Boeing, or from the date that a proper waiver of service adhering to the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d) is provided to Boeing, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. (gk)
December 23, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 90 days from date of service of complaint filed by Defendant Boeing Company Inc The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Julie LeMaye Hussey added to party Boeing Company Inc The(pty:dft))(Hussey, Julie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE approved by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #12 . (Status Report due by 4/19/2022. Status Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (See order for details) (mrgo)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 90 days from the date of service of the summons and complaint re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants GE Aviation Materials, Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Time, #2 Declaration of Service)(Reich, Adam)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/6/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (See minute order for details) (mrgo)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See attached document for details) (mrgo)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-09421 GW(JCx). (rn)
December 8, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
December 3, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs M.J., Anthony G. Johnson, Grace Johnson, J.J., in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/22/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants GE Aviation Materials, Inc., General Electric Company, served on 12-03-2021. (Reich, Adam)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant GE Aviation Materials, Inc. identifying General Electric Company as Corporate Parent. (Reich, Adam)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant General Electric Company identifying General Electric Company as Corporate Parent. (Reich, Adam)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants GE Aviation Materials, Inc., General Electric Company. (Reich, Adam)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sup. Ct of Cal., Los Angeles Cty, case number 21STCV43030 Receipt No: ACACDC-32426895 - Fee: $402, filed by defendants General Electric Company, GE Aviation Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Reich, #2 Exhibit A to Reich Decl - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Reich Decl - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C to Reich Decl - Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit E to Reich Decl - LexisNexis Public Record, #6 Declaration of Garry L. Montanari, #7 Declaration of Julie L. Hussey) (Attorney Adam Michael Reich added to party GE Aviation Materials, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Michael Reich added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Reich, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grace Johnson et al v. Gary Yeung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Johnson
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.J.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAL Systems (U.S.) Holding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philippine Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City Los Angeles World Airports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company Inc The
Represented By: Julie LeMaye Hussey
Represented By: Daniel P Ridlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Adam Michael Reich
Represented By: Alyssa Katherine Tapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Aviation Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Michael Reich
Represented By: Alyssa Katherine Tapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?