Charles Trayon Gilbert v. G. Ford
Plaintiff: Charles Trayzon Gilbert
Defendant: G. Ford
Case Number: 2:2021cv09474
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause, no later than January 24, 2022, why the action should not be dismissed. (see document for further details) (hr)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to Charles Trayzon Gilbert CDC P-23761, Mule Creek State Prison, PO Box 409040, Ione, CA. 95640. Filed by Plaintiff Charles Trayzon Gilbert. (et)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant G. Ford pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson., filed by plaintiff Charles Trayzon Gilbert. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Trayon Gilbert v. G. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Trayzon Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?