Sandra Martin et al v. Baj Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sandra Martin, Stanley Brown, Elizabeth Brown and Charlotte Bland
Defendant: Baj Management, Inc. doing business as Prospect Manor
Case Number: 2:2021cv09575
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 21 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Sandra Martin. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Brian Vogel) (Vogel, Brian)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT BAJ MANAGEMENT, INC. dba PROSPECT MANOR'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT. #18 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: Defendant has set the motion for a day the Court's calendar is full and, therefore, closed. Counsel are directed to refer to the Motion Calendar under this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court. Any future motion will be stricken for failing to set it on a date the Court is hearing motions. The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from March 7, 2022 to May 16, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule of motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 2, 2022 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Motion to Strike (FRCP 12(f) #18 filed by Defendant Baj Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-HHS Declaration of Public Health Emergency, #3 Exhibit C-Governor Newsom Declaration, #4 Exhibit D-SII Declaration, #5 Exhibit E-Trump Declaration of Emergency, #6 Exhibit F-1.27.21 Executive Order N-02-21, #7 Exhibit H-Removal, #8 Exhibit I-PREP Act Declaration, #9 Exhibit J-Amended PREP Act Declaration, #10 Exhibit K-2nd Amended PREP Act Declaration, #11 Exhibit L-4.16.20 OCG AO, #12 Exhibit M-List Countermeasures, #13 Exhibit N-10.22.20 HHS AO, #14 Exhibit O-OGC AO 1.8.2021, #15 Exhibit P-4th Amended HHS Declaration, #16 Exhibit Q-5th Amended HHS Declaration, #17 Exhibit R-8.14.20 HHS Letter, #18 Exhibit S-Designation of Scarce Materials by HHS, #19 Exhibit T-Rachal v. Natchitoches decision, #20 Exhibit U-CA DPSS Provider Information Notices, #21 Exhibit V-CDC 3.8.20 Updated Guidance, #22 Exhibit W-PIN 20-23 ASC Updated Guidance on Covid, #23 Exhibit X-Umbrella EUA for surgical masks, #24 Exhibit Y-Hand Sanitizer Revised FINAL Guidance, #25 Exhibit Z-7.31.20 CDC PH Guidance for Community Related Exposure, #26 Exhibit AA-1.7.21 CDC Study Re: Asymptomatic Spread)(Schlueck, Krista)
February 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Motion to Strike (FRCP 12(f) filed by defendant Baj Management, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Krista M. Schlueck, #3 Exhibit BB to Declaration of Krista M. Schlueck) (Schlueck, Krista)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT of Joint Rule 26(f) filed by Defendant Baj Management, Inc.. (Schlueck, Krista)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (DKT. #15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED IN PART. The deadline for the parties to file a Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report (Dkt. #10 ) remains 1/28/2022. In addition, the following deadlines are set: The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is continued to 2/2/2022. Defendant shall file any motion to dismiss on or before that date. On or before 2/16/2022, Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the forthcoming motion to dismiss. Defendant shall file any reply on or before 2/23/2022. (2) On or before 2/2/2022, Plaintiffs shall file any motion to remand. On or before 2/16/2022, Defendant shall file any opposition to the forth coming motion to remand. Plaintiffs shall file any reply on or before 2/23/2022 (jp)
January 14, 2022 Filing 15 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Baj Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlueck, Krista)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #13 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (Dkt. 1-1) is continued from December 17, 2021 to January 14, 2022. (lom)
December 15, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Baj Management, Inc. answer now due 1/14/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Baj Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlueck, Krista)
December 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. More than 30 days. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
December 14, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Baj Management, Inc. answer now due 1/18/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Baj Management, Inc..(Schlueck, Krista)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/28/2022. (tj)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Baj Management, Inc.. correcting Request for Judicial Notice,,, #3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Corrected Request for Judicial Notice)(Schlueck, Krista)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Baj Management, Inc., (Schlueck, Krista)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Baj Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-PREP Act Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Declaration Invoking PREP Act, #4 Exhibit D-Second Amended Declaration Invoking PREP Act, #5 Exhibit E-4th Amended HHS Declaration, #6 Exhibit F-HHS Letter PREP Act 8/14/2020, #7 Exhibit G-HHS Advisory Opinion 10/22/20, #8 Exhibit H-RPEP Act Advisory Op by HHS, #9 Exhibit I-PREP Act Covered Devices and Tests, #10 Exhibit J-5th Amended Declaration Under PREP Act, #11 Exhibit K-HHS Advisory OPinion 21-01 1/8/2021, #12 Exhibit L-Statement of Interest of U.S., #13 Exhibit M-Designation of Scarce Materials by HHS, #14 Exhibit N-Rachal v. Nachitoches)(Schlueck, Krista)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Baj Management, Inc.. (Schlueck, Krista)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number 21STCV40177 Receipt No: ACACDC-32460478 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Baj Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Attorney Krista Schlueck added to party Baj Management, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schlueck, Krista)
December 10, 2021 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Baj Management, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Sandra Martin, Elizabeth Brown, Charlotte Bland, Stanley Brown. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/01/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandra Martin et al v. Baj Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Martin
Represented By: Brian I Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Brown
Represented By: Brian I Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Brown
Represented By: Brian I Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Bland
Represented By: Brian I Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baj Management, Inc. doing business as Prospect Manor
Represented By: Krista Schlueck
Represented By: Evan J. Topol
Represented By: Kim Suzanne Cruz
Represented By: Ryan G. Canavan
Represented By: William C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?