Hee Soon Park v. Dollinger Lost Hills Associates, A California Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Hee Soon Park
Defendant: Dollinger Lost Hills Associates, A California Limited Partnership and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv09576
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (CV-11D) is Attachment 1 to this filing, and should have been submitted separately. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety #14 , this action is placed in inactive status. By 3/7/2022, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 3/8/2022. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint #11 . Having reviewed and considered Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #12 , the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims. The Court dismisses the state law claims without prejudice. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason)
February 3, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Dollinger Lost Hills Associates, A California Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Signed Application Consent to Magistrate)(Attorney Richard Michael Kelly added to party Dollinger Lost Hills Associates, A California Limited Partnership(pty:dft))(Kelly, Richard)
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Parkto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act, Disabled Persons Act, Health & Safety Code, and negligence claims. In responding to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages Plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by 1/18/2022. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act, Disabled Persons Act, Health & Safety Code, and negligence claims and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1367(c). Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dollinger Lost Hills Associates, A California Limited Partnership. (et)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32460564 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Hee Soon Park(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hee Soon Park v. Dollinger Lost Hills Associates, A California Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hee Soon Park
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollinger Lost Hills Associates, A California Limited Partnership
Represented By: Richard Michael Kelly
Represented By: Michael Mengarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?