Jonathan William McKinney v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Jonathan William McKinney
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 2:2021cv09620
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (hr)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-09131 DSF(AGRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09620 DSF(AGRx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (lh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonathan William McKinney v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan William McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?