Larry Stewart v. P Ayala
Plaintiff: Larry Stewart
Defendant: P Ayala
Case Number: 2:2021cv09638
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant P Ayala amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 filed by Plaintiff Larry Stewart. (hr)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . Plaintiff's Complaint (Docket No. 1) is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he shall file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days, which cures the pleading defects discussed herein. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING SCREENING IN PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Until the Complaint has been screened and the Court has ordered that service of process may occur, Plaintiff may not proceed with service of process on any Defendant. (see document for further details) (hr)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $0.00 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (hr)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 INMATE STATEMENT REPORT filed by Petitioner Larry Stewart.(hr)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (mrgo)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California State Prison, Los Angeles County (LAC) in Lancaster is DIRECTED to submit a certified Prison Trust Account Statement for Larry Stewart AF-0017 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account Statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified Prison Trust Account Statement in pdf format to PrisonerFilings_CACD@cacd.uscourts.gov with the case number and inmate name in the subject line as reflected on this notification. filed by petitioner Larry Stewart. (mrgo)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against respondent P Ayala pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing fee due-IFP pending), filed by petitioner Larry Stewart. (mrgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry Stewart v. P Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?