Shayquan Conston v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Shayquan Conston
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv09686
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-9686 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Shayquan Conston. (Herrera, Betty)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Margaret Branick-Abilla added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Branick-Abilla, Margaret)
January 12, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shayquan Conston, served on 01/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Herrera, Betty)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order Re Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi for Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Social Security Administration. (et)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi for Office of the Attorney General of the United States. (et)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi for Civil Process, US Attorneys Office. (et)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #5 MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Shayquan Conston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Herrera, Betty)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shayquan Conston, identifying Betty Herrera. (Herrera, Betty)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shayquan Conston. (Herrera, Betty)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shayquan Conston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Herrera, Betty)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Shayquan Conston. (Attorney Betty Herrera added to party Shayquan Conston(pty:pla))(Herrera, Betty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shayquan Conston v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayquan Conston
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?