Luz Zendejas v. Madera Development, LLC
Plaintiff: Luz Zendejas
Defendant: Madera Development, LLC and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv09692
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety and that the parties are finalizing their written settlement agreement #12 , this action is placed in inactive status. By 2/17/2022, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 2/18/2022. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. The Order to Show Cause dated 1/6/2022 #11 is discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act, Disabled Persons Act, Unfair Competition Law, and negligence claims. In responding to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages Plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by 1/18/2022. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act, Disabled Persons Act, Unfair Competition Law, and negligence claims and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1367(c). Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Madera Development, LLC. (jtil)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luz Zendejas. (Kim, Jason)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32483733 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Luz Zendejas(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luz Zendejas v. Madera Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Zendejas
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?