David Edward Herrmann v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Edward Herrman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: David Edward Herrmann, o/b/o Tina M. Herrmann (Deceased)
Case Number: 2:2021cv09737
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. See Local Rule 11-3.8 Title Page. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Edward Herrman, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/27/2021, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C Torres. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie L. Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Barasch, Stuart)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Jennifer A. Kenney added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Plaintiff will promptly served the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. [See document for further details.] (et)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (et)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Edward Herrmann, o/b/o Tina M. Herrmann (Deceased), (Barasch, Stuart)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff David Edward Herrmann, o/b/o Tina M. Herrmann (Deceased). (Barasch, Stuart)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant David Edward Herrmann, o/b/o Tina M. Herrmann (Deceased). (Barasch, Stuart)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32492007 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff David Edward Herrmann, o/b/o Tina M. Herrmann (Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stuart Barasch added to party David Edward Herrmann, o/b/o Tina M. Herrmann (Deceased)(pty:bkmov))(Barasch, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Edward Herrmann v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Edward Herrmann, o/b/o Tina M. Herrmann (Deceased)
Represented By: Stuart Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Edward Herrman
Represented By: Stuart Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?