Victoria Moron v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Moron
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv09744
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
2 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason M Avelar counsel for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Jason M. Avelar is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Avelar, Jason)
September 26, 2022 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James P Leonard counsel for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Adding James P. Leonard as counsel of record for Nissan North America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney James P Leonard added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Leonard, James)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than June 2, 2023. The parties shall file a joint report no later than seven (7) days after the ADR proceeding regarding the progress of settlement discussions. (shb)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart below. Discovery cut-off February 24, 2023., Exhibit List due by June 30, 2023., Witness List due by June 30, 2023., Motions in Limine to be filed by June 16, 2023., Last date to conduct settlement conference is June 2, 2023., Final Pretrial Conference set for July 28, 2023 at 1:00 p.m., Jury Trial set for August 14, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Any request for continuance of trial must be filed no later than one (1) week prior to the Final Pretrial Conference. Requests extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court.IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
August 10, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration #24 , Declaration #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: No proof of service filed In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: On July 27, 2022, the Court issued an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure of counsel for PlaintiffKevin Y. Jacobson and Gregory Sogoyanand counsel for DefendantJason M. Avelar and Robert A. Shieldsto file the Court-ordered case management statement [Dkt. #20 ]. On August 9, 2022, the parties filed their Joint Case Management Statement (the "Statement") [Dkt. #21 ] and counsel for Plaintiff filed a Declaration (the "Declaration") [Dkt. #22 ] in response to the Court's OSC. Furthermore, on August 10, 2022, counsel for Defendant filed their respective Declarations (the "Declarations") [Dkts. #23 & #24 ] in response to the Court's OSC. The Court accepts the Declarations and Statement and hereby orders the OSC DISCHARGED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Robert Shields re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #20 filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Shields, Robert)
August 10, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Jason Avelar re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #20 filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Avelar, Jason)
August 9, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Kevin Jacobson re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #20 filed by Plaintiff Victoria Moron. (Jacobson, Kevin)
August 9, 2022 Filing 21 STATEMENT Case Management filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. re: Order #19 . (Avelar, Jason)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURTS REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court ORDERS counsel for PlaintiffKevin Y. Jacobsonand Gregory Sogoyanand counsel for DefendantJason M. Avelar and Robert A. Shieldsto show cause why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for their failure to comply with the Courts Reassignment Order. Counsel is required to respond in writing on or before August 10, 2022, at 12:00 noon. Counsels failure to respond, or counsels filing of an unsatisfactory response, may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-120) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09744-SSS-Ex. (aco)
May 24, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Attorneys filed by plaintiff Victoria Moron. (Jacobson, Kevin)
April 22, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carmen G Espinosa counsel for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Carmen G. Espinosa is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Espinosa, Carmen)
April 22, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason M Avelar counsel for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Adding Jason M. Avelar as counsel of record for Nissan North America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Jason M Avelar added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Avelar, Jason)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-09326 AB(JCx) (ap)
March 21, 2022 Filing 13 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #12 filed by Plaintiff Victoria Moron. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin Y. Jacobson)(Jacobson, Kevin)
March 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.3.1 Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-09326-AB-JC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tilahun Complaint)(Espinosa, Carmen)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2023 01:30 PM ; Jury Trial set for 5/16/2023 09:00 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 5/8/2023 at 01:30 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc... (Espinosa, Carmen)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for February 14, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
December 16, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Nissan North America, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Victoria Moron. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/12/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
December 16, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/13/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
December 16, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Victoria Moron, upon Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Lai Saevang-Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/17/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H) (ghap)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 re Plaintiff Victoria Moron served on December 16, 2021. (Espinosa, Carmen)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., identifying Victoria Moron; Nissan North America, Inc.; Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Espinosa, Carmen)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Espinosa, Carmen)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV42055 Receipt No: ACACDC-32494267 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carmen G. Espinosa In Support Of Notice Of Removal Of Action, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Nissan's Answer, #4 Exhibit C - Statement and Designation by Foreign Corporation, #5 Exhibit D - Nissan's Entity Details, #6 Exhibit E - Sales Contract, #7 Exhibit F - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit G - Repair Order, #9 Exhibit H - All Other Pleadings) (Attorney Carmen G Espinosa added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Espinosa, Carmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victoria Moron v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Moron
Represented By: Kevin Y Jacobson
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen G Espinosa
Represented By: Robert A Shields
Represented By: Jason M Avelar
Represented By: James P Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?