Caviar Mickens v. Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Caviar Mickens
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, Los Angeles Police Department and Division of AdultParole Operations and Path
Case Number: 2:2021cv09798
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
2 Judge: John F Walter
3 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #18 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.1.1, the applicant must register to use the Court's CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Court's website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (hr)
January 19, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (hr)
January 19, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION in Support MOTION for Order for U.S. Marshal Services to Serve Summon (sic) of Complaint to Specific Defendants #15 filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (hr)
January 19, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Order for U.S. Marshal Services to Serve Summon (sic) of Complaint to Specific Defendants #15 filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (hr)
January 19, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Order for U.S. Marshal Services to Serve Summon (sic) of Complaint to Specific Defendants filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (hr)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR FILING FEE INSTALLMENT SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: denying #8 REQUEST. As Plaintiff was already granted in forma pauperis status (dkt. no. 10) and is not an incarcerated litigant, he is not required to make payments and the request is DENIED as MOOT. (hr)
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-09798-JFW-KS. (aco)
December 28, 2021 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) (es)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Caviar Mickens: SEE ATTACHED certificate of service to the filing complaint thereon December 20,2021. And thereby the reason, plaintiff accidently filed mistaken certificate of service as identified under a different District court jurisdiction served on 12/13/21. (lc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST AND ORDER OF PAYMENT FILING FEE INSTALLMENT SCHEDULE; PURSUANT 28 USC 1914(c)-1915(a);FRCP 16 filed by plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (lc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTACHMENT OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (jtil)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Attached Financial Disclosure filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (jtil)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (jtil)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens. (jtil)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Caviar Mickens against Defendants Division of Adult Parole Operations and Path, Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, Los Angeles Police Department.Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV71, #2 Summons Request) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caviar Mickens v. Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caviar Mickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of AdultParole Operations and Path
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?