The Lovesac Company v. Stitch Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Lovesac Company
Defendant: Stitch Industries, Inc. and Stitch Industries, Inc. doing business as Joybird
Case Number: 2:2021cv09904
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 19 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/01/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #18 filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Platt, Brian)
January 14, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Stitch Industries, Inc. answer now due 2/18/2022, filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company.(Platt, Brian)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brent P. Lorimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Lovesac Company and designating Alyssa Caridis as local counsel #13 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian N. Platt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Lovesac Company and designating Alyssa Caridis as local counsel #12 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:21-cv-09904 MCS(KSx). (rn)
January 3, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brent P. Lorimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Lovesac Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32558682) filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian N. Platt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Lovesac Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32558555) filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company, upon Defendant Stitch Industries, Inc. served on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Caridis, Alyssa)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian N Platt on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brent P Lorimer on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Stitch Industries, Inc. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company, identifying Fidelity Management and Research Co., LLC. (Caridis, Alyssa)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company. (Caridis, Alyssa)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company. (Caridis, Alyssa)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32528059 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff The Lovesac Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I) (Attorney Alyssa Margaret Caridis added to party The Lovesac Company(pty:pla))(Caridis, Alyssa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lovesac Company v. Stitch Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lovesac Company
Represented By: Alyssa Margaret Caridis
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: Clement S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stitch Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stitch Industries, Inc. doing business as Joybird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?