AA Lighting, Inc. v. Globe Electric Company Inc.
Plaintiff: AA Lighting, Inc.
Defendant: Globe Electric Company Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv09950
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Blakeley S Oranburg counsel for Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc.. Adding Blakeley S. Oranburg as counsel of record for Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Global Electric Company Inc.. (Attorney Blakeley S Oranburg added to party Globe Electric Company Inc.(pty:dft))(Oranburg, Blakeley)
February 25, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc., identifying Globe Electric Holdings Inc., AA Lighting, Inc., Globe Electric Company Inc., Novacap Industries V LP, Glen Palmer Holdings Inc., Fondaction, Le Fonds de dveloppement de la confdration des syndicats nationaux pour la coopration et lemploi, Fonds de solidarit des travailleurs du Qubec (F.T.Q.), Robert Esposito, Adam Chaimberg. (Boyajian, Nina)
February 24, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc. identifying Global Electric Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Boyajian, Nina)
February 24, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Howard Tafler, #2 Proposed Order) (Boyajian, Nina)
February 24, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nina D. Boyajian counsel for Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc.. Adding Nina D. Boyajian as counsel of record for Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc.. (Attorney Nina D. Boyajian added to party Globe Electric Company Inc.(pty:dft))(Boyajian, Nina)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #18 . (jp)
February 23, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 3/26/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Songfong)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 3/26/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #16 . The document(s) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Document incorrectly filed as a "Motion". No motion hearing date set. Pursuant to L.R. 8-3, document should have been filed as a Stipulation with attached proposed order. (jre)
February 23, 2022 Filing 16 (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #17 ) - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 3/26/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong) Modified on 2/23/2022 (jre).
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc., upon Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Debbie Freitas, Executive Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Wang, Songfong)
January 25, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #11 by Clerk of Court to Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken due to the deficiencies listed at #13 . (jp)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. (2) Proof of Service (subsequent document) event utilized in docketing this filing. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
January 21, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Globe Electric Company Inc. answer now due 2/24/2022, filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc..(Wang, Songfong)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 1/25/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #14 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #8 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #3 Debbie Freitas served on 01/04/2022. (Wang, Songfong). Modified on 1/25/2022 (jp).
January 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Globe Electric Company Inc. (lh)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by AA Lighting, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc., (Wang, Songfong)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32535766 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AA Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Attorney Songfong Tommy Wang added to party AA Lighting, Inc.(pty:pla))(Wang, Songfong)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AA Lighting, Inc. v. Globe Electric Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AA Lighting, Inc.
Represented By: Songfong Tommy Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Electric Company Inc.
Represented By: Blakeley S Oranburg
Represented By: Nina D. Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?