Josean Posey v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Josean Posey
Defendant: City of Los Angeles, DOES 1-100, and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv09982
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3, filed by Plaintiff Josean Posey.. (Dixon, Ronda)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Plowden, Geoffrey)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT City of Los Angeles, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on January 4, 2022. (Plowden, Geoffrey)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/25/2022. (tj)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
December 31, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
December 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
December 29, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Josean Posey. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Josean Posey. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
December 29, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Los Angeles, Does 1-100, inclusive amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Josean Posey. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/29/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT City of Los Angeles, (Plowden, Geoffrey)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Plowden, Geoffrey)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV30035 Receipt No: ACACDC-32544484 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court - Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court - Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court - August 10, 2020 Order on Court Fee Waiver, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court - August 12, 2021 Proof of Service, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court - January 19, 2021 Minute Order re Case Management Conference, #10 Exhibit 10 - State Court - April 19, 2021 Minute Order re Case Management Conference, #11 Exhibit 11 - State Court - June 18, 2021 Minute Order (Status Conferene re Default), #12 Exhibit 12 - State Court - Declaration of Ronda R. Dixon IN RE CMC, #13 Exhibit 13 - State Court - August 6, 2021 Proof of Service, #14 Exhibit 14 - State Court - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings, #15 Exhibit 15 - State Court - Substitution of Attorney, #16 Exhibit 16 - State Court - August 17, 2021 Minute Order re Case Management Conference, #17 Exhibit 17 - State Court- Plaintiff's FAC, #18 Exhibit 18 - State Court - December 1, 2021 Proof of Service, #19 Exhibit 19 - State Court - December 3, 2021 Minute Order (Status Conference re Pleadings and Service), #20 Exhibit 20 - State Court - Summons_City of Los Angeles) (Attorney Geoffrey R Plowden added to party City of Los Angeles (pty:dft))(Plowden, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josean Posey v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josean Posey
Represented By: Ronda R. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Geoffrey R Plowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?