Cecilia Virginia Martinez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv10004
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cecilia Virginia Martinez, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aghai, Sima)
February 8, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL(Joint Stipulation) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . [See order for further details.] (es)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (es)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ. (Aghai, Sima)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ, (Aghai, Sima)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ. (Aghai, Sima)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ. (Aghai, Sima)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ. (Attorney Sima G Aghai added to party CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ(pty:pla))(Aghai, Sima)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cecilia Virginia Martinez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIA VIRGINIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Sima G Aghai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?