Federal Insurance Company v. Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc. and Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv10016
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1701 Shipping/Maritime
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc., identifying New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
January 31, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc..(Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc. (pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, upon Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jacob Wu - Clerk & Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-08974 SB (SKx); 2:21-cv-9159 MCS (PDx); 2:21-cv-08985 SB (PDx); 2:21-cv-09007 MCS (PDx); 2:21-cv-09083 MWF (MRWx); 2:21-cv-09400 RSWL (MARx); 2:21-cv-09605 FLA (JPRx); 2:21-cv-08784-RSWL-MAR; 2:21-cv-82000-CJC-AS; 2:21-cv-10016-FLA-GJS (Southwick, Joshua)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-07655 CJC(ASx) (rn)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.. (car)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, identifying Federal Insurance Company - insurer of cargo; Drive DeVilbiss Healthcare - cargo owner. (Southwick, Joshua)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32549908 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua A Southwick
Represented By: Michael J Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?