Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Worldwide Logistics Limited et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Worldwide Logistics Limited, Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles), Inc., De Well Container Shipping, Inc., Soonest Express, Inc, T.H.I. Group (Shanghai) Ltd. KUL20120006, Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc. and T.H.I. Group Shanghai Ltd. KUL20120006
Case Number: 2:2022cv00155
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 39 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of New York, 1:22-cv-04215 filed 5/23/2022. (iv)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR THE CONVENIENCE OF THE PARTIES, WITNESSES AND INTERESTS OF JUSTICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS ORDERED that this action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). IT IS SO ORDERED. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
May 19, 2022 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of New York filed by Defendants Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., Worldwide Logistics Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Uthoff, Stephen)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING DEFENDANT T.H.I. GROUP (SHANGHAI) LTD. by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re Response, #35 . hereby Orders as follows: The Order to Show Cause is discharged; and Defendant T.H.I. GROUP (SHANGHAI) LTD. is dismissed, with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and fees. (et)
May 9, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant T.H.I. Group (Shanghai) LTD (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Southwick, Joshua)
April 25, 2022 Filing 34 MINUTES OF ZOOM SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - (Continued) held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Hearing held by Zoom and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel, as stated on the record. The Court continues the Scheduling Conference to May 23, 2022, at 11:00 A.M., to be held by Zoom. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. The Court grants plaintiffs request to extend its Order to Show Cause #33 as to defendant T.H.I. Group Shanghai LTD KUL20120006. Therefore, plaintiffs Order to Show Cause is hereby extended to May 23, 2022. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (shb)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than May 13, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant T.H.I. GROUP SHANGHAI LTD. KUL20120006, only. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to ShowCause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider an answer by defendant T.H.I. GROUP SHANGHAI LTD. KUL20120006, or plaintiffs request for entry of default on this defendant on or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. (shb)
April 18, 2022 Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference #26 and Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #31 . The 4/25/2022 Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM will be held by Zoom. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 12, 2022 Filing 31 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.. (Southwick, Joshua)
March 25, 2022 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant T.H.I. Group Shanghai Ltd. KUL20120006 served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon T.H.I. Group (Shanghai) LTD in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
March 23, 2022 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant De Well Container Shipping, Inc. (Rose, Bradley)
March 23, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant De Well Container Shipping, Inc..(Attorney Bradley Rose added to party De Well Container Shipping, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rose, Bradley)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than April 7, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendants DE WELL CONTAINER SHIPPING, INC.; and T.H.I. GROUP SHANGHAI LTD. KUL20120006, only. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the following: A proof of service of summons and complaint on defendant T.H.I. GROUP SHANGHAI LTD. KUL20120006; and An answer by defendant DE WELL CONTAINER SHIPPING, INC., or plaintiff's request for entry of default on this defendant on or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. (lom)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference is set for 4/25/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj)
March 10, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Worldwide Logistics Limited.(Uthoff, Stephen)
March 10, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc..(Uthoff, Stephen)
March 8, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Soonest Express, Inc, identifying Soonest Express, Inc.; St. Paul Fire; and Marine Insurance Co.. (Krieger, Lynn)
March 8, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Defendant Soonest Express, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Soonest Express, Inc.(Krieger, Lynn)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF THE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS LIMITED AND TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC. ONLY #18 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth causes of action are dismissed, without prejudice, as to WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, LTD and TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC only; WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, LTD. and TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC. shall file an answer to the remaining COGSA claim in plaintiff's Complaint herein no later than March 11, 2022. (lom)
February 22, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Worldwide Logistics Limited, identifying Worldwide Logistics, Ltd.; New York Marine & General Insurance; Prosight Specialty Insurance; Avlon Risk Management. (Uthoff, Stephen)
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., identifying TopOcean Consolidated Service (Los Angeles) Inc.; New York Marine & General Insurance; Prosight Specialty Insurance; Avlon Risk Management. (Uthoff, Stephen)
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 Joint REQUEST to Dismiss 2nd, 3rd, and 4th Causes of Action without prejudice as to TopOcean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc. and Worldwide Logistics Ltd. only filed by Defendants Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., Worldwide Logistics Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Uthoff, Stephen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc. answer now due 2/25/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc..(Attorney Stephen M Uthoff added to party Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc.(pty:dft))(Uthoff, Stephen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Worldwide Logistics Limited answer now due 2/25/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Worldwide Logistics Limited.(Attorney Stephen M Uthoff added to party Worldwide Logistics Limited(pty:dft))(Uthoff, Stephen)
February 2, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Soonest Express, Inc answer now due 3/7/2022, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Cummins, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Soonest Express, Inc served on 1/14/2022, answer due 2/4/2022. in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc. served on 1/14/2022, answer due 2/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Janson Wu - Clerk & Authorized to Accept in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Worldwide Logistics Limited served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gina Quinn - Operations Manager Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant De Well Container Shipping, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants De Well Container Shipping, Inc., Soonest Express, Inc, T.H.I. Group Shanghai Ltd. KUL20120006, Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc., Worldwide Logistics Limited. (car)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying The Phoenix Insurance Company; The Travelers Indemnity Company; Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc; Travelers Property Casualty Corp.; The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE/ NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, identifying United Furniture Industries, Inc.; Logo Brands, Inc.; UMA Enterprises, Inc.; Logo Brands, Inc.; Southern Enterprises, LLC; Premier Paint Roller Company. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Southwick, Joshua)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32586779 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Worldwide Logistics Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Joshua A Southwick
Represented By: Michael J Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Logistics Limited
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Well Container Shipping, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Rose
Represented By: Frank C Brucculeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soonest Express, Inc
Represented By: Lynn L Krieger
Represented By: Matthew Mihaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.H.I. Group (Shanghai) Ltd. KUL20120006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.H.I. Group Shanghai Ltd. KUL20120006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?