Edwin Eduardo Perez et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Eduardo Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez and Monica Perez
Defendant: FCA US, LLC, and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00201
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Filing 44 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiffs EDWIN EDUARDO PEREZ, EDWIN LEONEL PEREZ, and MONICA PEREZ and Defendant FCA US, LLC's have agreed FCA will pay $35,000.00 to resolve Plaintiffs' attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs. (iv)
February 8, 2023 Filing 43 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) (Dolin, Tionna)
January 26, 2023 Filing 42 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. The Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
January 26, 2023 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Debora Rabieian counsel for Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. Adding Debora Rabieian as counsel of record for EDWIN EDUARDO PEREZ, EDWIN LEONEL PEREZ, and MONICA PEREZ for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff EDWIN EDUARDO PEREZ, EDWIN LEONEL PEREZ, and MONICA PEREZ. (Rabieian, Debora)
January 25, 2023 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by plaintiff Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna)
January 25, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Section I of Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123 has erroneous information in name section. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 68(a) [filed 1/23/23; Docket No. #37 ]; and ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL FOR PURPOSE OF ENTERING JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. The Court VACATES the dismissal of this action for the sole purpose of entering judgment. The parties are ordered to file a proposed Judgment in this action no later than January 27, 2023. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (iv)
January 23, 2023 Filing 37 Notice filed by plaintiff Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment and Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) (Rabieian, Debora)
January 23, 2023 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Debora Rabieian counsel for Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. Adding Debora Rabieian as counsel of record for EDWIN EDUARDO PEREZ, EDWIN LEONEL PEREZ, and MONICA PEREZ for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff EDWIN EDUARDO PEREZ, EDWIN LEONEL PEREZ, and MONICA PEREZ. (Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Edwin Eduardo Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Monica Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Edwin Leonel Perez (pty:pla))(Rabieian, Debora)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. As a result of the parties' violation of the Court's CMO, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 3, 2023, the Trial scheduled for February 28, 2023, and any other dates calendared in this matter are hereby VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
October 4, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC. Filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Trina M. Clayton added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Clayton, Trina)
October 3, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Edward Eduardo Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez, and Monica Perez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Edward Eduardo Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez, and Monica Perez. (Haw, Christine)
October 3, 2022 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Edward Eduardo Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez, and Monica Perez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Edward Eduardo Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez, and Monica Perez. (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Edwin Eduardo Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Monica Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Edwin Leonel Perez (pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
October 3, 2022 Filing 31 Expert Witness Report REPORT of of Jeff Richards filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Shepardson, Scott)
September 16, 2022 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Report Re Settlement Conference Status filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 15, 2022 Filing 29 Text Entry Order STRIKING Request for Substitution of Counsel #28 . Refer to the Court's Scheduling and Case Management Order #25 - this request requires a declaration from counsel seeking to substitute into the case.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 15, 2022 Filing 28 *Stricken* REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer P. Hugret in place of attorney Scott S. Shepardson; Stephen T. Grimsrud filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shepardson, Scott) Modified on 8/15/2022 (sr).
June 16, 2022 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez and Edwin Leonel Perez. (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Edwin Eduardo Perez, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Edwin Eduardo Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez and Monica Perez. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Edwin Eduardo Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Monica Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Edwin Leonel Perez (pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Jury Trial set for 2/28/2023 at 8:30AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2023 at 8:00AM. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. (et)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter.The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on March 28, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: 9/12/2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: 9/16/2022. (et)
March 14, 2022 Filing 23 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez, (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 14, 2022 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 11, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Wrong event and form used, the correct event is "Notice">"Notice of Lodging" and the correct form CV 11D form has to be attached. Please refer to General Order 18-11.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
March 10, 2022 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Shepardson, Scott)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for March 28, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before March 14, 2022. (iv)
February 17, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, (Shepardson, Scott)
February 17, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.(Attorney Scott Steven Shepardson added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Shepardson, Scott)
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Christine Haw filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Haw, Christine)
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Edwin Eduardo Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Monica Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Edwin Leonel Perez (pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
January 29, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Edwin Eduardo Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Monica Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Edwin Leonel Perez (pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez, upon Defendant DOES served on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022; FCA US, LLC served on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified. Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant FCA US, LLC. (iv)
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs' Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Law, Daniel)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: The Defendant name in the "TO" section does not match the Complaint verbatim. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (aco)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs' Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs' Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez, identifying Edwin Eduardo Perez. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Dolin, Tionna)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32597647 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs' Edwin Eduardo Perez, Monica Perez, Edwin Leonel Perez. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Edwin Eduardo Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Monica Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Edwin Leonel Perez (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwin Eduardo Perez et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Eduardo Perez
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Debora Rabieian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Leonel Perez
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Debora Rabieian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Perez
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Debora Rabieian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Represented By: Stephen T Grimsrud
Represented By: Stephen T. Grimsrud
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?