Daniel Bader v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL BADER and Daniel Bader doing business as Sea Landing Dive Center
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, USDOJ BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, US States Department of Justice and Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Case Number: 2:2022cv00202
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Bader, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Asst. Atty Gen for Admin Justice. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to ATF Glendale, CA office. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Williams, Mark)
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ORDER RE TRANSFER filed by plaintiff Daniel Bader. (Williams, Mark)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See attached document for details) (mrgo)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-07693 PA(MRWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge Fernando M. Olguin to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00202 PA(MRWx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn)
January 13, 2022 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, US States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice. (iv)
January 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Daniel Bader. Related Case(s): CR 20-600-GW; 19-cv-7693-PA-MRW; 2:21-cv-07065-PA-MRW (Williams, Mark)
January 13, 2022 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant US States Department of Justice. (iv)
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives. (iv)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Daniel Bader. (Williams, Mark)
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Daniel Bader. (Williams, Mark)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Daniel Bader. (Williams, Mark)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Williams, Mark)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Williams, Mark)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 01/10/2022, receipt number ACACDC-32597737), filed by plaintiff DANIEL BADER.(Williams, Mark)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32597737 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF DANIEL BADER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Mark M Williams added to party DANIEL BADER(pty:pla))(Williams, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Bader v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BADER
Represented By: Mark M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bader doing business as Sea Landing Dive Center
Represented By: Mark M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDOJ BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?