Virginia Mendoza et al v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Mendoza and Reza Dastani
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00210
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court GRANTS Defendant Hyundai Motor America's motion to compel arbitration #11 . The Court hereby STAYS the proceedings in this case pursuant to 9 U.S.C. section 3. The case shall be administratively closed for the duration of the stay. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court within ten days after the resolution of any arbitration proceedings or dispute between the parties. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
April 26, 2022 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Virginia Mendoza and Reza Dastani for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Virginia Mendoza and Reza Dastani. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Reza Dastani(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Virginia Mendoza(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration #11 presently scheduled for hearing on March 4, 2022, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 2, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Virginia Mendoza and Reza Dastani for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Mendoza and Reza Dastani. (Pardo, Matthew)
March 2, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Soheyl Tahsildoost on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
March 2, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo on behalf of Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Reza Dastani(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Virginia Mendoza(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Defendant's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration #11 hearing on March 4, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. shall take place by Zoom Videoconference ("Zoom") and the clerk shall email the video link to the parties. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #11 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
February 11, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #11 In Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza. (Law, Daniel)
February 11, 2022 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #11 filed by Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Virginia Mendoza, #2 Declaration Declaration of Reza Dastani)(Law, Daniel)
February 11, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Virginia Mendoza and Reza Dastani for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Mendoza and Reza Dastani. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Reza Dastani(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Virginia Mendoza(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
January 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Reza Dastani, Virginia Mendoza. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 28, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #11 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
January 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Soheyl Tahsildoost in support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration) (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America.(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
January 10, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Hyundai Motor America. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Virginia Mendoza, Reza Dastani. (FILED IN VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2021-00558999 Receipt No: ACACDC-32600244 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Soheyl Tahsildoost added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virginia Mendoza et al v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Mendoza
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reza Dastani
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Soheyl Tahsildoost
Represented By: Sasha Bassi
Represented By: Ali Ameripour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?