Karina Isabel Velasquez v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Plaintiff: KATRINA ISABEL VELASQUEZ and Karina Isabel Velasquez
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co, DOES 1-25, inclusive,, Southwest Airlines Co. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00309
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 5/9/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference (MSC) set for 2/25/2022 and issues this case management order. The request by Plaintiffs counsel to appear remotely at the MSC is denied as moot. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) report #10 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/18/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 5/9/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 7/8/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/15/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/15/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 7/29/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 8/12/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 8/5/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 10/21/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 11/4/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Joseph A. Lepera Request for Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiff Karina Isabel Velasquez. (Lepera, Joseph)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co... (Pardasani, Natasha)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on February 25, 2022 before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by February 15, 2022. (jgr)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
January 14, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 14, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Southwest Airlines Co. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Karina Isabel Velasquez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/01/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Pardasani, Natasha)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co (Pardasani, Natasha)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Pardasani, Natasha)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV40063 Receipt No: ACACDC-32626670 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Southwest's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Plaintiffs Statements of Damages) (Attorney Natasha Mikha Pardasani added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:dft))(Pardasani, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karina Isabel Velasquez v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATRINA ISABEL VELASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Isabel Velasquez
Represented By: Joseph Antonio Lepera
Represented By: Donel Revita Lopez
Represented By: Patrick Anthony Hormillosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co
Represented By: Natasha Mikha Pardasani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Natasha Mikha Pardasani
Represented By: Nicole Ashley Poltash
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?