Chrome Hearts LLC v. 1800 Laboratories LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chrome Hearts LLC
Defendant: 1800 Laboratories LLC, Matthew Jack Brock, Matthew Lee Brock and Does 1-10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00643
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chrome Hearts LLC, upon Defendant Matthew Lee Brock served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Matthew Lee Brock, Individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Currie, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Chrome Hearts LLC, upon Defendant Matthew Jack Brock served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mathew Jack Brock, Individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Currie, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Chrome Hearts LLC, upon Defendant 1800 Laboratories LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Matthew Jack Brock, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Currie, Tara)
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tara Amber Currie counsel for Plaintiff Chrome Hearts LLC. Adding Tara Amber Currie as counsel of record for Chrome Hearts LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Chrome Hearts LLC. (Attorney Tara Amber Currie added to party Chrome Hearts LLC(pty:pla))(Currie, Tara)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants 1800 Laboratories LLC, Matthew Lee Brock, Matthew Jack Brock. (ghap)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Chrome Hearts LLC. (Hu, Qiongyue)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chrome Hearts LLC, identifying None. (Hu, Qiongyue)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chrome Hearts LLC. (Hu, Qiongyue)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chrome Hearts LLC. (Hu, Qiongyue)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32702352 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Chrome Hearts LLC. (Attorney Qiongyue Hu added to party Chrome Hearts LLC(pty:pla))(Hu, Qiongyue)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chrome Hearts LLC v. 1800 Laboratories LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrome Hearts LLC
Represented By: Qiongyue Hu
Represented By: Brent H Blakely
Represented By: Tara Amber Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1800 Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jack Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lee Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?