Securities and Exchange Commission v. Safeguard Metals LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Safeguard Metals LLC and Jeffrey S. Santulan
Case Number: 2:2022cv00693
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Safeguard Metals LLC. correcting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rigali, Paul)
March 28, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donald W. Searles counsel for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Amy J. Longo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Searles, Donald)
March 28, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by DEFENDANTS Securities and Exchange Commission.(Attorney Paul Anthony Rigali added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Rigali, Paul)
March 17, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donald W. Searles counsel for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Adding Donald W. Searles as counsel of record for Securities and Exchange Commission for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Donald W. Searles added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Searles, Donald)
February 11, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, of Standing Order on Defendants' Counsel served on February 11, 2022. (Polish, Jonathan)
February 11, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Polish, Jonathan)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Polish to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, designating Amy Longo as local counsel #13 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-00691 JFW(SKx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00693 JFW(SKx). Signed by Judge John F. Walter (rn)
February 4, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Jeffrey S. Santulan waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/1/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Paul A. Rigali. (Longo, Amy)
February 4, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Safeguard Metals LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/1/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Paul A. Rigali. (Longo, Amy)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court hereby orders that Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice #5 is stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order 10-07 and/or the Courts Case Management Order as indicated: Application not hand signed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 3, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Polish to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longo, Amy)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #6 Non-Resident Attorney Jedediah B. Forkner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission, designating Amy J. Longo as local counsel. (lom)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Safeguard Metals LLC, Jeffrey S. Santulan. (ghap)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Polish to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jedediah B. Forkner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longo, Amy)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 [STRICKEN REFER TO DOCUMENT NUMBER 14] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Polish to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longo, Amy) Modified on 2/3/2022 (vv).
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-00691 (Longo, Amy)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Amy J. Longo added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Longo, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Safeguard Metals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jedediah B. Forkner
Represented By: Jonathan S. Polish
Represented By: Amy J. Longo
Represented By: Donald W. Searles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Metals LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Rigali
Represented By: Jerry A. Behnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Santulan
Represented By: Paul Anthony Rigali
Represented By: Jerry A. Behnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?