Securities and Exchange Commission v. Michael M. Beck et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Michael M Beck and Helen P Robinson
Case Number: 2:2022cv00812
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 21, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint #1 filed by Defendant Helen P Robinson. (gk)
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint #1 filed by Defendant Michael M Beck. (gk)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 17, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. correcting Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 (Tercero, Roberto)
March 17, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy J. Longo counsel for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Amy Jane Longo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
March 17, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy J. Longo counsel for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Amy J. Longo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
March 3, 2022 Filing 13 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Helen P Robinson answer now due 3/24/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tercero, Roberto)
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Michael M Beck answer now due 3/24/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tercero, Roberto)
March 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Local Rule 83-1.4.1) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
February 22, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Helen P Robinson served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Relief Defendant Helen P. Robinson in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Longo, Amy)
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Michael M Beck served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Relief Defendant Helen P. Robinson - co-resident/co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Longo, Amy)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Michael M Beck and Helen P Robinson. (jtil)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Amy J. Longo added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Longo, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Michael M. Beck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J. Longo
Represented By: Roberto A Tercero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen P Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?