Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC v. Livecast 365, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Integrated Sports Media & Entertainment PPV, LLC
Defendant: Livecast 365, LLC, One Palm Group, LLC, Timothy Devore, Charles Lang, Jr., Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, Timothy Brill Devore, Charles Chuck Lang, Jr., Does 1 through 25, inclusive and Crown Stone Partners, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC, Stanley Stephen Huntsman and Tony Martinez
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Lester Brown
Case Number: 2:2022cv00980
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 108 REPLY support MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, and One Palm Group, LLC PLAINTIFF ISMES RULE 37 MOTION TO COMPEL COLIN NIX DEFENDANTS TO ENGAGE IN DISCOVERY PROCESS AND FOR SANCTIONS #103 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Gregory Lehrmann)(Lehrmann, Gregory)
May 22, 2023 Filing 107 NOTICE of Change of address by Milord A Keshishian attorney for Defendant Timothy Brill Devore. Changing attorneys address to 333 S. Hope Street, Suite 4025, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant Timothy Brill Devore. (Keshishian, Milord)
May 19, 2023 Filing 106 OPPOSITION Opposition to re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, and One Palm Group, LLC PLAINTIFF ISMES RULE 37 MOTION TO COMPEL COLIN NIX DEFENDANTS TO ENGAGE IN DISCOVERY PROCESS AND FOR SANCTIONS #103 filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. (Beck, Paul)
May 15, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, and One Palm Group, LLC #103 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is incorrect. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian hears motions on Tuesdays at 9:30 a.m. See judge's Procedures and Schedules page on the courts website. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE (In Chambers) ORDER CONTINUING/RELOCATING HEARING ON IMPROPERLY NOTICED MOTION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, and One Palm Group, LLC #103 . The Magistrate Judge is located in the Roybal Federal Building - 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012-1565 - and regularly hears discovery motions either telephonically or in Courtroom 750 on Tuesdays, at 9:30 a.m. In light of the foregoing, the hearing on the Motion is continued one day to Tuesday June 13, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. and, absent notification from the Clerk that the hearing will be held telephonically or further Court Order, will take place in Courtroom 750 of the Royal Federal Building. (hr)
May 11, 2023 Filing 103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, and One Palm Group, LLC PLAINTIFF ISMES RULE 37 MOTION TO COMPEL COLIN NIX DEFENDANTS TO ENGAGE IN DISCOVERY PROCESS AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendants Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF GREGORY A. LEHRMANN IN SUPPORT OF ISMES MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ISMES MOTION TO COMPEL AND AWARD OF SANCTIONS, #3 Supplement PROOF OF SERVICE)(Berglund, Keith)
April 26, 2023 Filing 102 Notice filed by defendant/counter plaintiff Charles Chuck Lang, Jr, Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 101 Notice filed by defendant/counter plaintiff Charles Chuck Lang, Jr, Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 100 Notice filed by defendant/counter plaintiff Charles Chuck Lang, Jr, Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 99 Notice filed by defendant/counter plaintiff Charles Chuck Lang, Jr, Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 98 Notice filed by defendant/counter plaintiff Charles Chuck Lang, Jr, Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 97 Notice filed by defendant/counter plaintiff Charles Chuck Lang, Jr, Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order #90 . The Parties' Stipulated Rule 502(d) Order is granted. (hr)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #94 Request to Substitute Attorney Milord A Keshishian for Timothy Brill Devore as attorney of record instead of Attorneys David D Samani; Craig E Holden and Stefan M. Palys. (lom)
March 24, 2023 Filing 94 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Milord A. Keshishian in place of attorney Stefan Palys Craig Holden, and David D. Samani filed by Defendant Timothy Brill Devore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keshishian, Milord)
March 24, 2023 Filing 93 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:22-cv-00980 DSF(JCx). (rn)
March 23, 2023 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Milord A Keshishian counsel for Defendant Timothy Brill Devore. Adding Kirstin A. Jensvold-Rumage as counsel of record for Timothy Brill DeVore for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Timothy Brill DeVore. (Keshishian, Milord)
March 23, 2023 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Milord A Keshishian counsel for Defendant Timothy Brill Devore. Adding Milord A. Keshishian as counsel of record for Timothy Brill DeVore for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Timothy Brill DeVore. (Attorney Milord A Keshishian added to party Timothy Brill Devore(pty:dft))(Keshishian, Milord)
March 23, 2023 Filing 90 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palys, Stefan)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Pro Se Stanley Stephen Huntsman in place and stead of Attorney Ellis Paul Robin #88 . (jp)
February 22, 2023 Filing 88 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Ellis Paul Robin as counsel of record Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal Of Counsel filed by Defendant Stanley Stephen Huntsman. (Robin, Ellis)
February 21, 2023 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Stanley Stephen Huntsman.(Attorney Ellis Paul Robin added to party Stanley Stephen Huntsman(pty:cd))(Robin, Ellis)
February 10, 2023 Filing 86 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Lester Brown has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
February 8, 2023 Filing 85 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Keith W Berglund counsel for Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. Changing Address/Phone number to 323-984-7446. Changing Phone number to 323-984-7446. Filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Berglund, Keith)
February 6, 2023 Filing 84 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant One Palm Group, LLC (Beck, Paul)
February 2, 2023 Filing 83 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss cause of action for abuse of process #74 STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW OPG PARTIES' COUNTERCLAIM PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41 (a) (1) (A) (ii) filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV.(Beck, Paul)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #74 set for February 6, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 27, 2023 Filing 81 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants and Counter Defendants Livecast 365, LLC, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #64 Served Stanley Huntsman served on 01-13-2023. (Holden, Craig)
January 23, 2023 Filing 80 REPLY support First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss cause of action for abuse of process #74 filed by Counter Defendant Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Berglund, Keith)
January 18, 2023 Filing 79 OPPOSITION Opposition to re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss cause of action for abuse of process #74 filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC, Counter Claimants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. (Beck, Paul)
January 16, 2023 Filing 78 ISME AND TONY MARTINEZ'S ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #64 ANSWER TO COUNTER-PLAINTIFF LIVECAST 365 LLC, TIMOTHY DEVORE AND CHARLES LANG'S COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST COUNTER-DEFENDANTS filed by COUNTER-DEFENDANTS Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC(a Nevada Limited Liability Company), Tony Martinez.(Attorney Keith W Berglund added to party Tony Martinez(pty:cd))(Berglund, Keith)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/17/23. (rfi)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 2/20/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
January 4, 2023 Filing 75 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2023 Filing 74 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss cause of action for abuse of process filed by COUNTER-DEFENDANT Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC(a Nevada Limited Liability Company). Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Berglund, Keith)
January 3, 2023 Filing 73 RULE 26(F) JOINT REPORT REPORT of RULE 26(F) REQUIREMENTS filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Berglund, Keith)
December 22, 2022 Filing 72 21 DAY Summons Issued re Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #64 as to Counter Defendant Stanley Stephen Huntsman, Tony Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued- Stanely)(rolm)
December 21, 2022 Filing 71 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #64 filed by Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
December 21, 2022 Filing 70 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #64 filed by Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
December 20, 2022 Filing 69 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #64 as to Counter Defendant Tony Martinez. (jp)
December 20, 2022 Filing 68 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #64 as to Counter Defendant Stanley Stephen Huntsman. (jp)
December 19, 2022 Filing 67 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #64 filed by Defendants and Counter Defendants Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
December 19, 2022 Filing 66 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #64 filed by Defendants and Counter Defendants Livecast 365, LLC. (Palys, Stefan)
December 7, 2022 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Amended Complaint/Petition, #52 DEFENDANTS GROVER HENRY COLIN NIX IV, ONE PALM GROUP, LLC, AND CROWN STONE PARTNERS, INC.'S ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND COUNTERCLAIM OF ONE PALM GROUP, LLC, GROVER HENRY COLIN NIX, IV AND CROWN STONE PARTNERS, INC. AGAINST INTEGRATED SPORTS MEDIA AND ENTERTAINMENT PPV, LLC FOR ABUSE OF PROCESS (FRCP 13), First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC.(Beck, Paul)
December 7, 2022 Filing 64 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #52 ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIM against Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Answer to Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Answer to Third Amended Complaint)(Palys, Stefan)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING #53 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. See order for specifics. (rfi)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Vacating Scheduling Conference #58 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
November 7, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response in Support of Motion,, #59 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #53 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants One Palm Group, LLC's, Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV's, and Crown Stone Partners, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)], #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Beck, Paul)
November 5, 2022 Filing 59 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #53 Defendants One Palm Group, LLC's, Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV's, and Crown Stone Partners, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. (Beck, Paul)
November 3, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #54 filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/28/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order) (Palys, Stefan)
November 1, 2022 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #53 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Berglund, Keith)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending Time to Respond to the Third Amended Complaint #55 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
October 26, 2022 Filing 55 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to 3rd Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palys, Stefan)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
October 24, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Crown Stone Partners, Inc., Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attorney Paul A Beck added to party Crown Stone Partners, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Beck, Paul)
October 17, 2022 Filing 52 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #39 , filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1: ISM 365 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exh 2: Livecast Non-Circumvention Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exh 3: Crown Stone Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exh 4: One Palm MOU, #5 Declaration Declaration of Mark Beychok)(Berglund, Keith)
October 5, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Document Nos. #44 and #50 were not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with flattened versions. (jp)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #46 ). Plaintiff may amend its complaint with respect to the third cause of action and to add a claim based on its non-disclosure agreement with Crown Stone Partners, Inc., in accordance with this Order by 10/17/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp) (Main Document 50 replaced on 10/5/2022) (jp).
September 11, 2022 Filing 49 REPLY filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC to Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #48 Defendants One Palm Group, LLC's and Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Declaration of Grover Henry Colin NIx, IV In Support Thereof (Beck, Paul)
September 6, 2022 Filing 48 opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jeffrey P. Berg In Support Thereof #46 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith Berglund, #2 Declaration Declaration of Albert Cantong, #3 Appendix Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Berg)(Berglund, Keith)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The hearing date on Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #46 was set less than 28 days from filing the Motion in violation of Local Rule 6-1. The Motion is re-set for hearing on 9/26/2022 at 01:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
August 26, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jeffrey P. Berg In Support Thereof filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Beck, Paul)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court hereby orders that Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #41 is stricken for the reasons stated in the Notice of Deficiency #42 : (1) Hearing information is missing. (2) Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. (3) Proposed Order shall be filed as a separate attachment to the e-filed "MOTION and/or NOTICE OF LODGING" and e-mailed to the generic chambers email a Microsoft Word version of the document. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint #43 . Further Ordered that ISM and Livecast Defendants shall participate in their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference on or before 9/9/2022. (jp)
August 22, 2022 Filing 43 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10 Business Days After Ruling on Motion to Dismiss re Amended Complaint/Petition, #39 filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palys, Stefan)
August 19, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)] #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Hearing information is missing. (2) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (3) Proposed Order shall be filed as separate attachment to the e-filed "MOTION and/or NOTICE OF LODGING" and e-mailed to Judge Fischer generic email addresses a Microsoft Word version of the document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
August 12, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jeffrey P. Berg In Support Thereof filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. (Beck, Paul)
August 10, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Livecast 365, LLC answer now due 8/24/2022, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #39 filed by Defendants Livecast 365, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holden, Craig)
July 21, 2022 Filing 39 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #29 , Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Berglund, Keith)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. #31 , #32 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
June 28, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. Notice of Errata (Attachments: #1 Corrected Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Berglund, Keith)
June 27, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)] ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #31 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #32 Defendants One Palm Group, LLC's and Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. (Beck, Paul)
June 27, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY In Support of Their NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #32 filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. (Holden, Craig)
June 21, 2022 Filing 34 to Investor Defendants' Motion to Dismiss opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)] ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #31 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Albert C. Cantong)(Berglund, Keith)
June 21, 2022 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #32 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Berglund, Keith)
June 3, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Holden, Craig)
June 3, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)] ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Beck, Paul)
May 27, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to 1st Amended Complaint By Not More than 30 Days filed by Defendants Livecast 365, LLC.(Holden, Craig)
May 13, 2022 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1, #2 Exh. 2, #3 Exh. 3)(Berglund, Keith)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #16 ). Plaintiff may amend its complaint with respect to the second through fifth claims by 5/15/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the DEFENDANTS LIVECAST 365, LLC, TIMOTHY DEVORE AND CHARLES LANG'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6) #16 set for April 11, 2022 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Motion to Compel Expedited Deposition (ECF No. 17) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Based on the foregoing, the Court determines that plaintiff has not demonstrated good cause for taking Mr.Durand's deposition on an expedited basis. Accordingly, plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 17) is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. denying #17 Motion to Take Deposition (ch)
March 29, 2022 Filing 25 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC, identifying INTEGRATED SPORTS MEDIA & ENTERTAINMENT PPV, LLC TONY MARTINEZ VINCENT ZABALA LIVECAST365, LLC ONE PALM GROUP, LLC TIMOTHY "BRILL" DEVORE CHARLES "CHUCK" LANG, JR. GROVER HENRY COLIN NIX IV.. (Holden, Craig)
March 28, 2022 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendants One Palm Group, LLC's and Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC (Beck, Paul)
March 28, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6); #16 filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC. (Holden, Craig)
March 25, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder inMOTION to Dismiss Case UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6); #16 filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
March 24, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6); #16 filed by Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Beck, Paul)
March 24, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul A Beck counsel for Defendants Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. Adding Paul Alan Beck, Esq. as counsel of record for One Palm Group, LLC and Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney for Defendants Paul Alan Beck. (Attorney Paul A Beck added to party Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV(pty:dft), Attorney Paul A Beck added to party One Palm Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Beck, Paul)
March 21, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6); #16 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (Berglund, Keith)
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Take Deposition of Rudy Durand. on Expedited Basis Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 26(d)(1) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): All discovery motions and stipulations, including those relating to protective orders, are to be calendared before the assigned magistrate judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
March 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Take Deposition of Rudy Durand. on Expedited Basis Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 26(d)(1) filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Berglund Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Berglund, Keith)
March 12, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) AND 12(b)(6); filed by Defendants Livecast 365, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Holden, Craig)
March 3, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Livecast 365, LLC answer now due 3/11/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Livecast 365, LLC.(Holden, Craig)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #11 , #13 Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Palys APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Livecast 365, LLC, designating Craig Holden as local counsel. (jp)
February 18, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Palys to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Livecast 365, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/17/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32804936) filed by Defendants Livecast 365, LLC. (Holden, Craig)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Palys to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Livecast 365, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32804936) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Palys to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Livecast 365, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32804936) filed by Defendants Livecast 365, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order G 64 Proposed Order) (Holden, Craig)
February 15, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Livecast 365, LLC answer now due 3/4/2022, filed by Defendant Livecast 365, LLC.(Holden, Craig)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Palys. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
February 11, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Timothy Brill Devore, Does, Charles Chuck Lang, Jr, Livecast 365, LLC, Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV, One Palm Group, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/11/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 11, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC, upon Defendant Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV served on 1/8/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 01/13/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Timothy Devore, Charles Lang, Jr., Livecast 365, LLC identifying Livecast 365, LLC state there is no parent corporation as Corporate Parent. (Samani, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Charles Lang re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Timothy Devore, Charles Lang, Jr., Livecast 365, LLC. (Samani, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Timothy Devore, Charles Lang, Jr., Livecast 365, LLC. (Samani, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV46516 Receipt No: ACACDC-32782823 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Timothy Devore, Livecast 365, LLC, Charles Lang, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stefan Palys, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 Summons of Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 4 Notice of Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit 5 Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 Exhibit 6 Certificate of Mailing re Notice of CMC, #8 Exhibit 7 Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer, #9 Exhibit 8 Minute order, #10 Exhibit 9 Notice of Case Reassignment, #11 Exhibit 10 Certificate of Mailing, #12 Exhibit 11 Notice of Ruling, #13 Exhibit 12 Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint), #14 Exhibit 13 Affidavit (Proof of Service of Summons re Grover Nix, IV, #15 Exhibit 14 Affidavit (Proof of Service of Summons re One Palm, #16 Exhibit 15 Affidavit (Proof of Service of Summons re Livecast 365, #17 Exhibit 16 Declaration of Henry Colin Nix, IV, #18 Request for Judicial Notice) (Attorney David D Samani added to party Timothy Devore(pty:dft), Attorney David D Samani added to party Charles Lang, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney David D Samani added to party Livecast 365, LLC(pty:dft))(Samani, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC v. Livecast 365, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrated Sports Media & Entertainment PPV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livecast 365, LLC
Represented By: David D Samani
Represented By: Craig E Holden
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Palm Group, LLC
Represented By: Paul A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Devore
Represented By: David D Samani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lang, Jr.
Represented By: David D Samani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grover Henry Colin Nix, IV
Represented By: Paul A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Brill Devore
Represented By: David D Samani
Represented By: Craig E Holden
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys
Represented By: Kirstin Anna Jensvold-Rumage
Represented By: Milord A Keshishian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Chuck Lang, Jr.
Represented By: David D Samani
Represented By: Craig E Holden
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Stone Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Integrated Sports Media and Entertainment PPV, LLC
Represented By: Keith W Berglund
Represented By: Gregory A Lehrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stanley Stephen Huntsman
Represented By: Ellis Paul Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Tony Martinez
Represented By: Keith W Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Lester Brown
Represented By: Lester O Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?