Frederick Brown v. Twin Towers Chief Medical Officer
Plaintiff: Frederick Brown
Defendant: Twin Towers Chief Medical Officer
Case Number: 2:2022cv01022
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause, no later than March 30, 2022, why the action should not be dismissed. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Request Form, #2 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form) (hr)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (jtil)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Frederick Brown against Defendant Twin Towers Chief Medical Officer, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick Brown v. Twin Towers Chief Medical Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Towers Chief Medical Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?