O.C. Multispecialty Surgery Center v. United HealthCare Services, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc., and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv01091
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Discovery cut-off 9/26/2022. Motions due by 10/3/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 1:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2022 at 9:00 AM. (iv)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for April 11, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (iv)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/3/2022. (iv)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
March 29, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Wurscher, Nicole)
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (iv)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-01091 PA(GJSx). (rn)
February 23, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc., (FILED IN STATE COURT) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT W TO NOTICE #7 .) (iv)
February 23, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT to Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC (FILED IN STATE COURT (2/7/2022) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT V TO NOTICE #7 .) (iv)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.,, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Amended Document (Non-Motion), #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 2/23/22. (Wurscher, Nicole)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Amended Exhibit W to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W - Conformed Answer to FAC)(Wurscher, Nicole)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
February 17, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/31/2021, attached as Exhibit C.(jtil)
February 17, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff O.C. Multispecialty Surgery Center in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/13/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.,, identifying UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Wurscher, Nicole)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Wurscher, Nicole)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV17904 Receipt No: ACACDC-32810190 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-X (State Court Filings), #2 Exhibit Y (Decl. of J. Stieglitz)) (Attorney Nicole Elizabeth Wurscher added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.,(pty:dft))(Wurscher, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.C. Multispecialty Surgery Center v. United HealthCare Services, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.,
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Wurscher
Represented By: Bryan Scott Westerfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?