Rafael Martirosyan v. Hakopyan et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Martirosyan
Defendant: Hakopyan, Montoya, L.A.S.D. Medical, Haley and L.A.S.D. Grievance Personnel
Case Number: 2:2022cv01169
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Clarification filed by plaintiff Rafael Martirosyan. (es)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTION(S) FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Plaintiff has filed an "Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order" ("Motion") along with an accompanying Affidavit. ECF Docket Nos. ("Dkts.") #6 , #7 . For the reasons set forth below, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice. [See Order for details.] Denying #6 MOTION for TRO (es)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #6 filed by Plaintiff Rafael Martirosyan. (iv)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Plaintiff Rafael Martirosyan. (iv)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, If Plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he is ORDERED to respond by no later than March 31, 2022, by choosing one (1) of the three (3) options discussed in Part V, below. Further, Plaintiff is admonished that, if he fails to timely respond, the Court may recommend that this action be dismissed without further leave to amend and with prejudice for failure to state a claim and follow the Court's orders. re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 See document for details. (es)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Plaintiff is advised that the Court is screening the Complaint in this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Until the Complaint has been screened and the Court orders that service of process may occur, Plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendants. If the Court determines that the Complaint may be served upon defendants, the Court will provide Plaintiff with instructions regarding service of process in a separate order. [See Order for further details.] (es)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Rafael Martirosyan. (car)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Defendants, filed by Plaintiff Rafael Martirosyan. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafael Martirosyan v. Hakopyan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Martirosyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakopyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A.S.D. Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A.S.D. Grievance Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?