American Civil Liberties Union Foundation et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, -
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2022cv01291
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, upon Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/7/2022, answer due 5/6/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Receptionist. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Individual. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Individual. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Chia, Liga)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #16 Non-Resident Attorney Michael K. T. Tan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, designating Liga Chia as local counsel. (lt)
March 8, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael K. T. Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, R #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING granting #10 #12 Non-Resident Attorney Noor Zafar APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, designating Liga Chia as local counsel. (lt)
March 7, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael K. T. Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32899559) filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order G-64 Order for Michael Tan) (Chia, Liga)
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carmen Iguina counsel for Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. Adding Carmen Iguina Gonzalez as counsel of record for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Iguina, Carmen)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01291 RGK(SKx). (rn)
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/1/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32872307) American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 PHV Receipt) (Chia, Liga)
March 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Noor Zafar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section I of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Couunsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
March 1, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Noor Zafar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32872307) American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chia, Liga)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Noor Zafar. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (shb)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Chia, Liga)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, identifying American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chia, Liga)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Chia, Liga)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32847379 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Liga Chia added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation(pty:pla), Attorney Liga Chia added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California(pty:pla))(Chia, Liga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Liga Chia
Represented By: Carmen Iguina
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Michael K. T. Tan
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California, -
Represented By: Liga Chia
Represented By: Carmen Iguina
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Michael K. T. Tan
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?