The Real USFL, LLC v. Fox Sports Inc et al
Plaintiff: The Real USFL, LLC
Defendant: Fox Sports Inc, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC, Fox Corporation, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, Fox Media LLC and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01350
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
2 Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp)
April 27, 2022 Filing 131 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Inc, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Sports Inc(pty:dft))(Wesley, Keith)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-080) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01350-FWS-MARx. (sn)
April 14, 2022 Filing 129 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Lodging #127 , Notice of Lodging #126 , Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #128 e-mailed to Eric B. Halper bounced due to a typo on email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to ehalper@mckoolsmith.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF THE REAL USFL, LLC'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [filed 3/17/22; Docket No. #71 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. (iv)
April 6, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Byrd, M. Storm)
April 6, 2022 Filing 126 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order / Proposed Statement of Decision Denying Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Bernstein, David)
April 4, 2022 Filing 125 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Dillman, Kirk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Ryan Grooms in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Professional Quality Equipment Quotation from PAC)(Dillman, Kirk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Steven Ehrhart in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - Letter from Carl Peterson dated June 18, 2007)(Dillman, Kirk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 122 DECLARATION of M. Storm Byrd in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fox News February 1, 2022 announcement of viewership ratings, #2 Exhibit 2 - shopusfl.com landing page, #3 Exhibit 3 - New Jersey Generals Logo Red Youth Premium T-Shirt item page, #4 Exhibit 4 - USFL Logo Grey Adult Short Sleeve T-Shirt item page, #5 Exhibit 5 - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered in the action Vans, Inc. et al. v. Walmart, Inc. et al., No. 8:21-cv-01876-DOC-KES (C.D.C.A. Mar. 31, 2022) (Dkt. No. 65))(Dillman, Kirk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 121 DECLARATION of David Brown in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A License Agreement American Classics September 30, 2011)(Dillman, Kirk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Jerry Argovitz in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Football Outsiders article dated February 24, 2022, #2 Exhibit C - New York Times article dated January 29, 1982, #3 Exhibit D - NFL Minimum Salaries Table prepared by Sportrac, #4 Exhibit E - Los Angeles Times article dated January 26, 2018)(Dillman, Kirk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 119 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Dillman, Kirk)
March 29, 2022 Filing 118 Text Entry Order: Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC, Fox Corporation, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. have failed to deliver Courtesy Copies of Dkt. Nos. #102 , #103 , #104 , #105 , #106 , #107 , #108 , #109 , #110 , #111 , #112 , #113 , #114 and #116 to Chambers in accordance with paragraph 3(c) of the Courts Standing Order. Counsel shall deliver Courtesy Copies that fully comply with the Court's requirements by 5:00 p.m. on March 29, 2022 or the documents will be stricken. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT #100 by Judge John F. Walter. The date for all Defendants in this case to respond to Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC's Amended Complaint is extended to fourteen (14) days following this Court'sruling on Plaintiffs Amended Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (iv)
March 28, 2022 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Bernstein, David)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew Petrozziello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Keith Wesley as local counsel #95 . (iv)
March 28, 2022 Filing 114 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for A Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wesley, Keith)
March 28, 2022 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Keith J. Wesley In Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Notices of Allowance for NEW ORLEANS BREAKERS, #2 Exhibit 2: Notices of Allowance for PITTSBURGH MAULERS, #3 Exhibit 3: Registration Certificate and Assignment for Reg. No. 4165542, #4 Exhibit 4: Registration Certificate and Assignment for Reg. No. 4808689, #5 Exhibit 5: Section 15 Acknowledgment for USFL, #6 Exhibit 6: Section 8 Declaration for USFL, #7 Exhibit 7: Selected WRHQ Trademark Applications, #8 Exhibit 8: Selected TSL Trademark Applications, #9 Exhibit 9: TSL Marks Licensed to USFL Enterprises, #10 Exhibit 10: Defunct Team Records, #11 Exhibit 11: Dead Old League TM Records, #12 Exhibit 12: The Real USFL LLC - Articles of Org)(Wesley, Keith)
March 28, 2022 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Christopher Lauzau in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Compilation of USFL Articles from January 1, 2022 to March 23, 2022)(Schaper, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 111 DECLARATION of James Hale in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 3, 2021 Press Release Announcing League, #2 Exhibit 2 - March 15, 2022 Fox Sports Article About League Schedule, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ticketmaster USFL Tickets for Sale on March 26, 2022, #4 Exhibit 4 Select Articles Where New USFL Distinguishes Itself from Old USFL, 2021-2022, #5 Exhibit 5 - December 20, 2021 XFL Newsroom Article About USFL Commercials, #6 Exhibit 6 - January 25, 2022 Deadline Article About Telecast, #7 Exhibit 7 - USFL Store Homepage on March 26, 2022, #8 Exhibit 8 - USFL Store Products Webpage on March 26, 2022, #9 Exhibit 9 - November 17, 2021 XFL Newsroom Article About Executive Team, #10 Exhibit 10 - January 8, 2022 American Football International Article About Education Program, #11 Exhibit 11 - March 10, 2022 Fox Sports Article About USFL Draft, #12 Exhibit 12 - January 25, 2022 Tweet by Governor Kay Ivey re USFL)(Kagan, Jared)
March 28, 2022 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Lindsey Noah McAdory, Jr. in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Kagan, Jared)
March 28, 2022 Filing 109 DECLARATION of James A. Stephens in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Schaper, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 108 DECLARATION of Brian Woods in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Compiled Media Articles Regarding Formation of New League, dated 2021 and 2022, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sun Sentinel Article Regarding Suspension of Play, dated Aug. 5, 1986, #3 Exhibit 3 - Esquire Article Regarding End of Old League dated Jan. 13, 2016, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 3, 2021 Press Release Announcing New League, #5 Exhibit 5 - License Agreement Between TSL and USFL Enterprises, #6 Exhibit 6 - Press Release Announcing Names and Logos Dated November 22, 2021, #7 Exhibit 7 - Compilation of Press Coverage of New League, dated 2021 and 2022, #8 Exhibit 8 - Inquirer Article re Ehrhart Objection to New League, dated June 3, 2021, #9 Exhibit 9 - The Real USFL LLC Articles of Org., dated March 25, 2022)(Kagan, Jared)
March 28, 2022 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Tad Snider in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Kagan, Jared)
March 28, 2022 Filing 106 DECLARATION of Jon Miller in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Kagan, Jared)
March 28, 2022 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Lynn Jordan in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Schaper, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 104 DECLARATION of Gene Hallman in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Schaper, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 103 DECLARATION of James Thomas Waggoner in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Schaper, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 102 DECLARATION of David H. Bernstein in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bernstein December 14, 2021 Letter to Strauss re USFL, #2 Exhibit 2 - Strauss December 17, 2021 Letter to Bernstein re USFL, #3 Exhibit 3 - January 2022 Emails Between Bernstein and Strauss, #4 Exhibit 4 - Bernstein January 27, 2022 Email to Strauss and Deixler, #5 Exhibit 5 - Bernstein February 2, 2022 Letter to Strauss and Deixler, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - American Classics January 10, 2022 Email and Royalty Statements)(Bernstein, David)
March 28, 2022 Filing 101 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick F. Philbin counsel for Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding Patrick F. Philbin as counsel of record for USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. (Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Fox Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Fox Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Fox Sports 1, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Fox Sports 2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Fox Sports Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Fox Sports Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick F. Philbin added to party Foxcorp Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(Philbin, Patrick)
March 26, 2022 Filing 100 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Amended Complaint/Petition, #67 filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint)(Bernstein, David)
March 25, 2022 Filing 99 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kyle T. West counsel for Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding Kyle T. West as counsel of record for Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC.. (Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Fox Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Fox Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Fox Sports 1, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Fox Sports 2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Fox Sports Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Fox Sports Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle T. West added to party Foxcorp Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(West, Kyle)
March 24, 2022 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marissa P. MacAneney counsel for Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding Marissa MacAneney as counsel of record for Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. (Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Fox Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Fox Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Fox Sports 1, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Fox Sports 2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Fox Sports Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Fox Sports Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa P. MacAneney added to party Foxcorp Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(MacAneney, Marissa)
March 24, 2022 Filing 97 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jared I Kagan counsel for Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding Jared I. Kagan as counsel of record for Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. (Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Fox Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Fox Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Fox Sports 1, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Fox Sports 2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Fox Sports Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Fox Sports Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jared I Kagan added to party Foxcorp Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(Kagan, Jared)
March 24, 2022 Filing 96 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Schaper counsel for Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding Michael Schaper as counsel of record for Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC; The Spring League, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. (Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Fox Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Fox Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Fox Sports 1, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Fox Sports 2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Fox Sports Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Fox Sports Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Schaper added to party Foxcorp Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(Schaper, Michael)
March 24, 2022 Filing 95 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew J. Petrozziello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33001398) filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Sports 1, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Sports 2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Sports Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Fox Sports Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Foxcorp Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)) (Wesley, Keith)
March 23, 2022 Filing 94 DECLARATION of David H. Bernstein Regarding Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Bernstein, David)
March 23, 2022 Filing 93 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Hal Bernstein counsel for Defendants Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding David H. Bernstein as counsel of record for The Spring League, LLC; USFL Enterprises, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC; USFL Enterprises, LLC; Fox Corporation; Fox Sports 1, LLC; Fox Sports 2, LLC; Fox Sports Holdings, LLC; Fox Sports Productions, LLC; Foxcorp Holdings, LLC; Fox Media LLC; and Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. (Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Fox Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Fox Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Fox Sports 1, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Fox Sports 2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Fox Sports Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Fox Sports Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Foxcorp Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(Bernstein, David)
March 22, 2022 Filing 92 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Corporation served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 22, 2022 Filing 91 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Sports Productions, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 22, 2022 Filing 90 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Sports Holdings, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 22, 2022 Filing 89 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Sports 2, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 22, 2022 Filing 88 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Sports 1, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 22, 2022 Filing 87 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Media LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 22, 2022 Filing 86 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 22, 2022 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Foxcorp Holdings, LLC served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 18, 2022 Filing 84 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #67 as to Defendant Fox Corporation, Fox Media LLC, Fox Sports 1, LLC, Fox Sports 2, LLC, Fox Sports Holdings, LLC, Fox Sports Inc, Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Fox Sports Productions, LLC, Foxcorp Holdings, LLC, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (iv)
March 17, 2022 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Kirk D. Dillman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Index of original registered marks 1982-1986, #2 Exhibit 2 Defendants registered and pending trademarks, #3 Exhibit 3 File History Reg. No. 4165542, #4 Exhibit 4 File History Reg. No.4808689, #5 Exhibit 5 Assignment of Interest February 2, 2021, #6 Exhibit 6 Assignment of Interest April 12, 2021, #7 Exhibit 7 Assignment of Interest January 4, 2022, #8 Exhibit 8 Fox Sports, Inc.s Press Release June 3, 2021, #9 Exhibit 9 Index of articles referencing Foxs purported revival of USFL, #10 Exhibit 10 Social media postings referencing Foxs purported revival of USFL, #11 Exhibit 11 Comparison of Fox league uniforms and the original USFLs, #12 Exhibit 12 The Detroit News article February 7, 2022, #13 Exhibit 13 Letter from B. Deixler to B. Woods August 20, 2021, #14 Exhibit 14 Letter from E. Lamb to B. Deixler September 21, 2021, #15 Exhibit 15 Email from B. Deixler to B. Woods August 2021, #16 Exhibit 16 Assignment L. Lemak to USFL February 28, 2022, #17 Exhibit 17 Assignment C. Peterson to USFL February 25, 2022, #18 Exhibit 18 Assignment R. Taubman to USFL February 25, 2022, #19 Exhibit 19 Assignment J. Argovitz to USFL February 25, 2022, #20 Exhibit 20 Assignment J. Canizaro to USFL February 28, 2022, #21 Exhibit 21 Assignment F. Bullard to USFL February 25, 2025, #22 Exhibit 22 Assignment W. Tatham to USFL February 25, 2022, #23 Exhibit 23 Assignment A. Duany to USFL February 21, 2022, #24 Exhibit 24 Assignment T. Taube to USFL February 28, 2022, #25 Exhibit 25 Assignment S. Ehrhart to USFL February 25, 2022, #26 Exhibit 26 Fox News article announcing Fox leagues eight teams November 22, 2021, #27 Exhibit 27 Criminal Complaint against J. Cuadra USDC SDCA June 24, 2013, #28 Exhibit 28 Amended Judgment against J. Cuadra USDC-SDCA January 30, 2014, #29 Exhibit 29 Fox Leagues Online Store March 17, 2022)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Robert Taubman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Byrd, Mason)
March 17, 2022 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Tad Taube in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Byrd, Mason)
March 17, 2022 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Stephen Strauss in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email from S. Strauss to L. Jordan December 9, 2021, #2 Exhibit B Letter from D. Bernstein to S. Strauss December 14, 2021, #3 Exhibit C Letter from S. Strauss to D. Bernstein December 17, 2021)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Paul Reeths in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Emails between P. Reeths and S. Ehrhart April 2009 August 2009, #2 Exhibit B Logo Permissions and Publication Release July 6, 2016)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Steven Ehrhart in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Damages Award Check March 15, 1990, #2 Exhibit B Memphis Commercial Appeal Article June 20, 2007, #3 Exhibit C Emails between M. Tolin and S. Ehrhart May 2008 to September 2009, #4 Exhibit D Emails between K. Dunek and S. Ehrhart October 2006 to April 2008, #5 Exhibit E Release of Rights April 21, 2008, #6 Exhibit F Emails between K. Dunek and S. Ehrhart July 19, 2010 and August 27, 2010, #7 Exhibit G License Agreement Forgotten Stars September 9, 2010, #8 Exhibit H License Agreement American Classics July 1, 2011, #9 Exhibit I Email between D. Brown and S. Ehrhart August 11, 2011, #10 Exhibit J American Classics Fourth Quarter Royalty Statements 2011-2021, #11 Exhibit K Fourth Quarter Royalty Check January 31, 2022, #12 Exhibit L Emails between P. Reeths and S. Ehrhart April 2009 and August 2009, #13 Exhibit M Logo Permissions and Publication Release July 6, 2016, #14 Exhibit N Philadelphia Inquirer Article June 3, 2021)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Ken R. Dunek in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Emails between K. Dunek and S. Ehrhart 2006 2010, #2 Exhibit B Release for use of USFL name, logo likeness April 4, 2008, #3 Exhibit C Philadelphia Inquirer Article July 7, 2011, #4 Exhibit D License Agreements August 26, 2010 and September 9, 2010, #5 Exhibit E The Team That Time Forgot webpage September 13, 2010, #6 Exhibit F Philadelphia Inquirer Article July 22, 2010)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Anthony Duany in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Byrd, Mason)
March 17, 2022 Filing 75 DECLARATION of David Brown in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A License Agreement American Classics September 30, 2011, #2 Exhibit B Emails between D. Brown and S. Ehrhart 2011-2016, #3 Exhibit C Pages from American Classics website October 24 2011, #4 Exhibit D Pages from American Classics webpage November 19, 2011, #5 Exhibit E D. Bernstein Demand Letter to D. Brown December 23, 2021, #6 Exhibit F Emails between D. Brown and D. Bernstein December 2021, #7 Exhibit G Letter to from D. Bernstein to D. Brown January 4, 2022, #8 Exhibit H Emails between D. Brown and D. Bernstein January 10, 2022)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Jerry Argovitz in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property #71 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2010 Reunion Event Article in Houston Chronicle June 13, 2010)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE INITIAL COMPLAINT #63 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC's and The Spring League, LLCs response date to Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLCs Complaint is extended from its current date of March 23, 2022. (iv)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Schaper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC, designating Keith Wesley as local counsel #66 . (iv)
March 17, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Infringing Use of Intellectual Property filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) (Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Marissa MacAneney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC, designating Keith Wesley as local counsel #65 . (iv)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jared Kagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC, designating Keith Wesley as local counsel #64 . (iv)
March 17, 2022 Filing 68 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #67 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 67 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Redline of Amended Pleading Per Judge Walter's Standing Order)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 66 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Schaper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32964568) filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wesley, Keith)
March 17, 2022 Filing 65 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marissa MacAneney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32964521) filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wesley, Keith)
March 17, 2022 Filing 64 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jared I. Kagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32964297) filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wesley, Keith)
March 15, 2022 Filing 63 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re to Extend Time to Respond to the Initial Complaint)(Bernstein, David)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle West to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC, designating Keith Wesley as local counsel #55 . (iv)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick Philbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC, designating Keith Wesley as local counsel #54 . (iv)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Slovacek to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #53 . (iv)
March 15, 2022 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant USFL Enterprises, LLC served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 15, 2022 Filing 58 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant The Spring League, LLC served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Agent for Service Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Byrd, Mason)
March 14, 2022 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Nicholas T. Matich re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 44 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Email from N. Matich to D. Bernstein dated March 9, 2022, #2 Exhibit B: Email from D. Bernstein to N. Matich dated March 9, 2022)(Matich, Nicholas)
March 14, 2022 Filing 56 DECLARATION of David H. Bernstein re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 44 Regarding Local Rule 7-3 Conference filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Bernstein, David)
March 14, 2022 Filing 55 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle T. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32942576) filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wesley, Keith)
March 14, 2022 Filing 54 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick F. Philbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32942444) filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wesley, Keith)
March 14, 2022 Filing 53 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph O. Slovacek to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32941634) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 14, 2022 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Keith J Wesley counsel for Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding Keith J. Wesley as counsel of record for Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC. (Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party The Spring League, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party USFL Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Wesley, Keith)
March 14, 2022 Filing 51 DECLARATION of David H. Bernstein Regarding Lead Trial Counsel re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #50 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #25 filed by Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (Bernstein, David)
March 14, 2022 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Hal Bernstein counsel for Defendants The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. Adding David H. Bernstein as counsel of record for USFL Enterprises, LLC and The Spring League, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants David H. Bernstein. (Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party The Spring League, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party USFL Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Bernstein, David)
March 11, 2022 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, upon Defendant Fox Sports Inc served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Byrd, Mason)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas Eisweirth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #45 . (iv)
March 9, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. correcting Declaration #46 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel)(Byrd, Mason)
March 9, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Nicholas T. Matich regarding Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Byrd, Mason)
March 8, 2022 Filing 45 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. Eisweirth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32912679) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 8, 2022 Filing 44 Text Entry Order: The Court has reviewed the Joint SubmissionRegarding Rule 7-3 Meet and Confer filed March 7, 2022 (Docket No. #35 ) and concludes that counsel have not conducted a proper Local Rule 7-3 conference based on a 30 minute video conference and their failure to detail the issues discussed and resolved during the conference and the issues remaining. March 3, 2022 Standing Order (Docket #25 ), 5(b). Accordingly, the parties shall conduct an additional Local Rule 7-3 conference by March 11, 2022. If the parties cannot resolve the issues raised by Real USFLs Motion, within three days of the meet and confer, lead counsel for each party shall file a declaration setting forth the issues resolved and those issues that were not resolved with a detailed explanation of why those issues could not be resolved. If a Motion remains necessary, it shall not be filed until three days after each party files the declaration required by this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas Matich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #34 . (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Radu Lelutiu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #33 . (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John Briody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #32 . (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Laura Baron to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #31 . (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Mark Lanier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #30 . (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Eric Halper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #29 . (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Zeke DeRose to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #28 . (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Alex Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, designating Storm Byrd as local counsel #27 . (iv)
March 7, 2022 Filing 35 STATEMENT regarding Rule 7-3 Meet and Confer filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Dillman, Kirk)
March 7, 2022 Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas T. Matich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32903909) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 7, 2022 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Radu. A. Lelutiu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32903769) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 7, 2022 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John C. Briody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32903716) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 7, 2022 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura Baron to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32903566) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 7, 2022 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark W. Lanier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32903440) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 7, 2022 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Halper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32903204) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 7, 2022 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zeke DeRose III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32903106) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 7, 2022 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alex J. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32902814) filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Byrd, Mason)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 65 [filed 3/2/22; Docket No. #18 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff filed its Motion before the case was reassigned to the Court, Plaintiff's Motion is denied without prejudice to refiling in full compliance with the Court's Standing Order and the Local Rules. (iv)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
March 3, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-01350 JFW(MARx). (rn)
March 2, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Kirk D. Dillman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Defendants' Use of USFL #18 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 2, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Paul Reeths in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Defendants' Use of USFL #18 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 2, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Steven Ehrhart in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Defendants' Use of USFL #18 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 2, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Ken R. Dunek in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Defendants' Use of USFL #18 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 2, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of David E Brown in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Defendants' Use of USFL #18 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Dillman, Kirk)
March 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Defendants' Use of USFL filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dillman, Kirk)
March 1, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. Eisweirth. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laura Baron. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Radu A. Lelutiu. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John C. Briody. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Halper. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph O. Slovacek. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Zeke DeRose III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alex J. Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark Lanier. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas T. Matich. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Fox Sports Inc, The Spring League, LLC, USFL Enterprises, LLC. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Real USFL, LLC. (Dillman, Kirk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC, (Dillman, Kirk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Dillman, Kirk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Dillman, Kirk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32861212 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff The Real USFL, LLC. (Attorney Kirk D. Dillman added to party The Real USFL, LLC(pty:pla))(Dillman, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Real USFL, LLC v. Fox Sports Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Real USFL, LLC
Represented By: Kirk D. Dillman
Represented By: Alex J. Brown
Represented By: Eric B. Halper
Represented By: John C. Briody
Represented By: Joseph O. Slovacek
Represented By: Laura Baron
Represented By: M. Storm Byrd
Represented By: Nicholas T. Matich, IV
Represented By: Radu A. Lelutiu
Represented By: Thomas J. Eisweirth
Represented By: W. Mark Lanier
Represented By: Zeke DeRose, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Sports Inc
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Spring League, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Venezia
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USFL Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Venezia
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Corporation
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Sports 1, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Sports 2, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Sports Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Sports Productions, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxcorp Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Media LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Kyle T. West
Represented By: Marissa P. MacAneney
Represented By: Matthew J. Petrozziello
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Patrick F. Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?