Arturo Bernal v. Alex Villanueva et al
Plaintiff: Arturo Bernal
Defendant: Alex Villanueva and Marroquin
Case Number: 2:2022cv01423
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #13 REQUEST for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to send the completed USM-285 forms as ordered in the Court's Order re Service of Process (ECF 10) is extended to May 16, 2022. Accordingly, the deadline for service of the Summons and Complaint upon Defendants is also extended to July 13, 2022. (hr)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Arturo Bernal. (et)
March 15, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 as to Defendants Marroquin, Alex Villanueva, Does 1-4. (clee)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (clee)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #7 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $19.86 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (clee)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Arturo Bernal. (hr)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. On or before April 4, 2022, Plaintiff is to pay the filing fees or submit a Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support (Form CV-60P). (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank CV-60P Form) (hr)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/1/2022.(Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/3/2022.]
March 2, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Arturo Bernal. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/3/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Arturo Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/3/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arturo Bernal v. Alex Villanueva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marroquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?