Patrick Ford v. Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Ford
Defendant: Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv01498
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the Receipt for Release of Exhibits to Counsel upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial 45 was inadvertently entered on this docket. (yl)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND JOINT STIPULATION TO REMAND ACTION (DKT. #43 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt #43 . Based on a review of the parties' Notice of Settlement and Joint Stipulation to Remand Removed Action (the Stipulation (Dkt. 43)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED. This action is remanded to the Los Angeles Superior Court, as Case No. 22STCV03063, at its Spring Street Courthouse, so that the settlement between the parties can be finalized. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
September 2, 2022 Filing 45 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (yl)
September 1, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation to Remand filed by Plaintiff Patrick Ford. (Bokhour, Mehrdad)
August 19, 2022 Filing 42 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE settling #41 Amended Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute; Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The parties are directed to promptly meet and confer to identify a mutually convenient date and time for Plaintiff's deposition to occur between Tuesday, August 23, 2022 and Friday, August 26, 2022. If the mediator is no longer available on August 30, 2022, the parties must contact Judge Kronstadt with any request to extend the mediation completion date. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 08/19/2022. (hr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 41 AMENDED MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE, amending #40 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute. Telephone Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (hr)
August 5, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Telephone Conference set for 8/16/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (hr)
August 3, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Special interrogatories and Responses to Special Interrogatories re Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 37 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Jason)
August 1, 2022 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT (DKT. 21) held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. On or before August 3, 2022, defense counsel shall file the interrogatories posed to, and the responses by Plaintiff, that were discussed at the hearing. Upon their filing, the Motion will then be taken UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. The status of settlement discussions is addressed. Counsel advises the Court that a mediation is currently scheduled for August 29, 2022 with a private neutral. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) Court Reporter: Judy Moore. (yl)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CHANGING THE TIME FOR THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT (DKT. #21 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On the Court's own motion, the TIME for the hearing is RESET from 8:30 a.m. to 9:30 a.m., on August 1, 2022. The hearing will proceed by zoom webinar. Counsel are directed to refer to the Court's Procedures and Schedules page found on the website for the United States District Court for zoom webinar information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (IN CHAMBERS) TEXT-ONLY ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (DKT. #21 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court (Dkt. #21 ) from July 25, 2022 to August 1, 2022 at a time to be set when the calendar for that date is finalized.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ssa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 18, 2022 Filing 35 FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION denying #30 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing re 32 (yl)
June 13, 2022 Filing 34 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Ford. (Burton, Anwar)
May 23, 2022 Filing 33 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Remanding Action to State Court in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Jason)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (IN CHAMBERS) TEXT-ONLY ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT (DKT. #30 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based on a review of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion for Order Remanding Action to State Court (Dkt. #30 ) and Defendant's Opposition to the Application (Dkt. #31 ), there is an insufficient basis to grant the requested relief. Therefore, the Application is DENIED. The hearing is set for July 25, 2022 with the specific time to be determined when the calendar for that date is issued. Conducting pre-certification discovery while the case is pending shall not cause a waiver of the right to pursue the motion to remand.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ssa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 11, 2022 Filing 31 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion for Order Remanding Action to State Court in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 to June 6, 2022 #30 filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Jason)
May 10, 2022 Filing 30 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 to June 6, 2022 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Ford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Burton, Anwar)
May 6, 2022 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT REGARDING AGREED UPON PRIVATE NEUTRAL filed by Plaintiff Patrick Ford. (Burton, Anwar)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (DKT. #26 ); AND ORDER DISMISSING DOES PARTIES 11 - 50 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court has reviewed the parties April 15, 2022 Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Dkt. 26) and sets the following deadlines: June 15, 2022 Last day to amend or add parties. August 30, 2022 Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation. September 12, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. post mediation status conference. (See document for further details) (yl)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than August 30, 2022. Post Meditation Status Conference set for 9/12/2022 11:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (tj)
April 15, 2022 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15, filed by Plaintiff Patrick Ford.. (Burton, Anwar)
April 8, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Reschedule Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for An Order to Remand Action to State Court filed by Defendants Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Jason)
April 5, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patrick Ford #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Notice of Interested Parties is Incomplete. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
April 5, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patrick Ford, (Burton, Anwar)
April 5, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Patrick Ford #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel shall file the Notice of Interested Parties on or before 4/7/2022. Failure to file the notice may result in the document being stricken. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
April 1, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Patrick Ford. Motion set for hearing on 7/18/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anwar Dillon-Thomas Burton added to party Patrick Ford(pty:pla)) (Burton, Anwar)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J. Centeno's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC, designating David B. Litt as local counsel. (hr)
March 31, 2022 Filing 19 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J Centeno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/30/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33032542) filed by Designee Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cert of Good Standing - USDC MA, #2 Supplement Cert of Good Standing USDC NY, #3 Supplement Cert of Good Standing USDC PA, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Petrullo, John)
March 30, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J Centeno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33032542) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): PA and MD state admissions missing. GSC from those state bars are not included. (lt)
March 30, 2022 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J Centeno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33032542) filed by Designee Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing NY, #2 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing Mass, #3 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing USDC East Penn, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Petrullo, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting #12 , #15 Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC, designating David B Litt as local counsel. (jp)
March 25, 2022 Filing 15 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/23/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996652) filed by Attorney Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Penn, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing NJ, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Petrullo, John)
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996652) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). (lt)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996652) #12 Fully Executed Application filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Petrullo, John)
March 23, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996652) filed by Attorney Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing NJ, #2 Supplement Certification of Good Standing Penn., #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney John Patrick Petrullo added to party Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC(pty:dft)) (Petrullo, John)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Jason)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DKT. #9 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Application is GRANTED. Defendant shall file the Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by 3/18/2022 at 5:00 PM., and it will be accepted as timely. (jp)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Murtagh, Jason)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/15/2022. (tj)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (rolm)
March 4, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC, Does. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Patrick Ford. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 01/26/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (rolm)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Jason)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC, identifying Heraeus Incorporated; Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Jason)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, case number 22STCV03063 Receipt No: ACACDC-32895924 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Attorney Jason E Murtagh added to party Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC(pty:dft))(Murtagh, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Ford v. Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ford
Represented By: Joshua Samson Falakassa
Represented By: Mehrdad Bokhour
Represented By: Anwar Dillon-Thomas Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heraeus Precious Metals North America LLC
Represented By: Jason E Murtagh
Represented By: David Benjamin Litt
Represented By: John Patrick Petrullo
Represented By: Joseph J. Centeno
Represented By: Rachel E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?