Kenneth Lee Armbruster v. D. Samual et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lee Armbruster
Defendant: D. Samual, California Mens Colony State Prison and Colter
Case Number: 2:2022cv01630
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from Kenneth Lee Armbruster. (vm)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: PRISONER LAWSUIT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. As anaccommodation to a self-represented litigant, and in recognition of the difficulties often presented by prison mail services, the Court: (a) directs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with another copy of the IFP denial order and statement of decision (Docket # 5); and (b) extends until June 1 the deadline by which Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that fully complies with the Courts screening order. Alternatively, Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss the action with no further consequence or financial cost to him. (See Minute Order for further details) (Attachments: #1 Order (Docket 5)) (vm)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Kenneth Lee Armbruster. (vm)
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 INMATE STATEMENT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Lee Armbruster. re: REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Mens Colony (CMC) in San Luis Obispo is DIRECTED to submiT #2 .(vm)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND WITHIN 30 DAYS. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED #2 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Lee Armbruster. CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Mens Colony (CMC) in San Luis Obispo is DIRECTED to submit a certified Prison Trust Account Statement for Kenneth Lee Armbruster CDC BH6032 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account Statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified Prison Trust Account Statement in pdf format to PrisonerFilings_CACD@cacd.uscourts.gov with the case number and inmate name in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (lh)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants California Mens Colony State Prison, Colter(Psychiatrist, official capacity), Colter(Psychiatrist, individual), D. Samual(Warden, official capacity), D. Samual(Warden, individual) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Lee Armbruster. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Lee Armbruster v. D. Samual et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lee Armbruster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Samual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Mens Colony State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?