Brandon Leon Bibbs v. Debra Cole Hall et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Leon Bibbs
Defendant: Debra Cole Hall and Los Angeles Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2022cv01730
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55411 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #5 as to plaintiff Brandon Leon Bibbs. (es)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Brandon Leon Bibbs, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #5 . (mat)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Brandon Leon Bibbs. Appeal of Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P), #4 Filed On: 3/22/22; Entered On: 3/22/22; Filing fee $ 505. Billed. (mat)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is hereby DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED immediately. Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. See Order for further details. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (es)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (rolm)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Brandon Leon Bibbs. (rolm)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Debra Cole Hall, Los Angeles Sheriff's Department. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, filed by plaintiff Brandon Leon Bibbs. (rolm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon Leon Bibbs v. Debra Cole Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Leon Bibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Cole Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?