Jordan Easley v. Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Jordan Easley
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv01784
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel P. Craig Cardon filed by Defendant Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company. (Cardon, P)
April 27, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of David K. Lietz filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley. (Straus, Alex)
April 27, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easleyto Order to Show Cause, #16 (Straus, Alex)
April 26, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company answer now due 5/18/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company.(Attorney P Craig Cardon added to party Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company(pty:dft))(Cardon, P)
April 26, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley. upon Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/20/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Alyssa Sones. (Lietz, David)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.Counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by April 28, 2022 why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. (iv)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David Lietz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Easley, et al., designating Alex Straus as local counsel #13 . (iv)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David K. Lietz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Easley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 4/8/2022, Receipt No. 33101007) filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Straus, Alex)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David K. Lietz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Easley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33101007) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. See Dkt. 4. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. DC missing. (lt)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David K. Lietz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jordan Easley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33101007) filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Straus, Alex)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley, (Straus, Alex)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company. (ghap)
March 18, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley. (Straus, Alex)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley. (Straus, Alex)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32965626 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jordan Easley. (Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Jordan Easley(pty:pla))(Straus, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan Easley v. Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Easley
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: David K. Lietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Alyssa Sones
Represented By: Benjamin O Aigboboh
Represented By: P Craig Cardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?