James Kuykendall v. Amazon Studios LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Kuykendall
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC, Hector Berrellez, John Massaria, Good Pixel Productions, Tiller Russell and Intellectual Property Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv01872
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING THE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #185 , the Complaint in this action shall be, and is, hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice, and without costs or fees assessed against any party. All motions pending at the time of this dismissal #184 are deemed DENIED AS MOOT, and the Court shall not maintain jurisdiction to entertain any future motions related to this action, including a motion for fees and costs, and no such motion shall be made by any party. (gk)
May 17, 2022 Filing 186 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #185 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. The proposed order is on page 3. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 16, 2022 Filing 185 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Kuykendall. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Amanat, F.)
May 11, 2022 Filing 184 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendants Hector Berrellez, Intellectual Property Corporation, Tiller Russell. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lao, Jason)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Jury Trial set for 8/22/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 8/4/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 12/16/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 1/13/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions 5/12/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 5/26/2023. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 7/14/2023. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 7/21/2023. See document for further details. (gk)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/26/2023. (cb)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the May 13, 2022, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 6, 2022 Filing 180 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Plaintiff James Kuykendall.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B -- Defendant Amazon Studios' Revised Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit C -- IPC Defendants' Revised Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D -- Defendant Amazon Studios' Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit E -- Defendant IPC Television LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Exhibit F -- Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Amanat, F.)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE STIPULATION REGARDING 26(F) REPORT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #178 , the Court hereby ORDERS that the parties shall have until 5/6/2022 to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report or their intended stipulation requesting a continuance of the Scheduling Conference and a briefing schedule on Defendants' anti-SLAPP motions. (gk)
April 29, 2022 Filing 178 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report or Intended Stipulation re Report and Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Amazon Studios, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Palacios, Diana)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #176 Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth P. Abbarno APPLICATION to Appear Pr Hac Vice on behalf of Kenneth P. Abbarno, designating Michael A. Akselrud as local counsel. (lom)
April 14, 2022 Filing 176 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth P. Abbarno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33129508) filed by Plaintiff James Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Akselrud, Michael)
April 7, 2022 Filing 175 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joel Richert counsel for Defendant Amazon Studios, LLC. Cydney Swofford Freeman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Amazon Studios, LLC. (Richert, Joel)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Sara C. Tesoriero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hector Berrellez and Tiller Russell, designating Jason T. Lao as local counsel #171 . (gk)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Cameron A. Stracher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hector Berrellez and Tiller Russell, designating Jason T. Lao as local counsel #170 . (gk)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney F. Franklin Amanat to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall, designating Michael Akselrud as local counsel #161 . (gk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 171 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sara C. Tesoriero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hector Berrellez, Tiller Russell (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33070380) filed by Defendants Hector Berrellez, Tiller Russell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, #4 Proposed Order) (Lao, Jason)
April 4, 2022 Filing 170 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cameron A. Stracher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hector Berrellez, Tiller Russell (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33070221) filed by Defendants Hector Berrellez, Tiller Russell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Connecticut, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Proposed Order) (Lao, Jason)
April 1, 2022 Filing 168 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation, (Prather, Laura)
April 1, 2022 Filing 167 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation.(Prather, Laura)
April 1, 2022 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hector Berrellez, (Lao, Jason)
April 1, 2022 Filing 165 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Hector Berrellez.(Attorney Jason T. Lao added to party Hector Berrellez(pty:dft))(Lao, Jason)
April 1, 2022 Filing 164 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tiller Russell, (Lao, Jason)
April 1, 2022 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Tiller Russell.(Attorney Jason T. Lao added to party Tiller Russell(pty:dft))(Lao, Jason)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Lutzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation, designating Jason T. Lao as local counsel #154 . (gk)
March 28, 2022 Filing 162 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Pro Hac Vice Application filed 3/25/2022 #151 . The document is stricken. (gk)
March 28, 2022 Filing 161 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney F. Franklin Amanat to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33020486) filed by Plaintiff James Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Akselrud, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 160 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Alex J. Brown on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
March 28, 2022 Filing 159 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Saul Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
March 28, 2022 Filing 158 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Greg G. Gutzler on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
March 28, 2022 Filing 157 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Carmel T. Kappus on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
March 28, 2022 Filing 156 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Bruce D Bernstein on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
March 28, 2022 Filing 155 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Laura Lee Prather on behalf of Defendants Amazon Studios, LLC, Intellectual Property Corporation. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney is a licensed California attorney, CSB 159759, admitted to this Court on 11/19/2007, is active and in good standing. (lt)
March 28, 2022 Filing 154 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Lutzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/25/2022, Receipt No. 33010605) filed by Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, #2 Proposed Order) (Lao, Jason)
March 25, 2022 Filing 153 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Lutzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33010605) #151 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Lists IPC Television, LLC as represented client, but there is no IPC Television, LLC listed on the docket. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
March 25, 2022 Filing 152 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff James Kuykendall, re Notice of Appearance #150 served on 03/25/2022. (Akselrud, Michael)
March 25, 2022 Filing 151 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS ON 3/28/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. 162] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Lutzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33010605) filed by Defendant Intellectual Property Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jason T. Lao added to party Intellectual Property Corporation(pty:dft)) (Lao, Jason) Modified on 3/28/2022 (gk).
March 25, 2022 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A. Akselrud on behalf of Plaintiff James Kuykendall (Attorney Michael A. Akselrud added to party James Kuykendall(pty:pla))(Akselrud, Michael)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 24, 2022 Filing 147 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sara C. Tesoriero on behalf of Defendants Hector Berrellez, John Massaria and Tiller Russell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 146 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cameron A Stracher on behalf of Defendants Hector Berrellez, John Massaria and Tiller Russell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 145 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gilberto Hinojosa on behalf of Amazon Studios, LLC and Intellectual Property Corporation. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 144 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laura Lee Prather on behalf of Defendants Amazon Studios, LLC and Intellectual Property Corporation. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 143 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alex J. Brown on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 142 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Saul Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Greg G. Gutzler on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 140 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carmel T. Kappus on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 139 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bruce D Bernstein on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 138 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Farzin Franklin Amanat on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 137 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 136 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 135 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
March 24, 2022 Filing 134 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 5:20-cv-00219, from USDC Southern District of Texas (Laredo). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-01872-AB (Ex). (et)
March 23, 2022 Filing 133 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Southern
March 18, 2022 Filing 132 Sealed ORDER re: #59 . Copies provided to all parties via first class mail, filed. (vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 131 Sealed ORDER re: #38 . Copies provided to all parties via first class mail( Advisory due by 4/13/2022 at 12:00 P.M. ), filed. (vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to Central District of California, Los Angeles Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 3/18/2022, filed. (vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 4, 2022 ***Attorney Sara Tesoriero was advised that the transcript requested, has already been produced re: #117 . Ms. Tesoriero needs to contact Veritext Legal Solutions and request a copy of the transcript, filed. (bmendoza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Filing 130 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sara Tesoriero for Transcript of Status Conference on 1/5/2022 before Judge Kazen. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions, filed. (Tesoriero, Sara) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Saul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(dgonzalez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to #116 MOTION to Vacate #86 Order, #97 Order,, filed by James Kuykendall. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 127 MOTION for Saul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2022. (Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Joel Richert to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(RobertTenorio, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 125 First MOTION for Joel Richert to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Amazon Studios LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2022. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 25, 2022 Filing 124 PROPOSED ORDER Denying re: #116 MOTION to Vacate #86 Order, #97 Order,, filed.(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 25, 2022 Filing 123 PROPOSED ORDER Denying re: #116 MOTION to Vacate #86 Order, #97 Order,, filed.(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Cristina M Salvato to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(RobertTenorio, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 25, 2022 Filing 121 First MOTION for Cristina M. Salvato to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Amazon Studios LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2022. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition to #116 MOTION to Vacate #86 Order, #97 Order,, filed by Amazon Studios LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Palacios, #2 Proposed Order)(Palacios, Diana) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition to #116 MOTION to Vacate #86 Order, #97 Order,, filed by Hector Berrellez, Intellectual Property Corporation, Tiller Russell. (Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 118 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #117 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT re: held on 01/05/2022 before Judge John A. Kazen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext Legal Solutions. Ordering Party DiCello Levitt & Gutzler Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2022., filed. (VeritextLegalSolutions, ) Modified on 1/14/2022 (vcantu, 5). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 116 MOTION to Vacate #86 Order, #97 Order, Motions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Carmel T. Kappus to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 114 RESPONSE to #111 Document , filed by James Kuykendall. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 113 ACKNOWLEDGMENT for 3-Day Transcript Request re: Status Conference held on 1/5/2022 before Hon. John A. Kazen. Log notes and audio forwarded to Veritext Legal Solutions., filed.(dmorales, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 112 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff for Transcript of Status Conference on 1/5/22 before Judge Kazen. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions, filed. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/5/2022. Plaintiff's counsel requested that the Court lift the previously imposed stay of general discovery (Dkt. No. 86) as to written discovery at this time. Amazon does not oppose engaging in document discovery and the Magistrate Judge clarified that third-party written discovery is not stayed, as agreed by all parties. The Court ORDERED Plaintiff to file a motion to lift the general discovery stay by 1/12/2022 and Defendants to file responses by 1/24/2022. Appearances by Zoom videoconference: F. Franklin Amanat f/PLAINTIFF. Laura L. Prather, Gilberto Hinojosa and Diana Palacios f/DEFENDANT AMAZON STUDIOS, LLC. Cameron Stracher and Sara Tesoriero f/DEFENDANTS HECTOR BERRELLEZ, JOHN MASSARIA AND TILLER RUSSELL. Laura L. Prather and Alexander Bjorn Lutzky f/DEFENDANT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION. (Time in court: 9:03 - 9:33 a.m.) (ERO: Ben Mendoza), filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Filing 111 Letter to Judge Marmolejo and Judge Kazen by Hector Berrellez, Intellectual Property Corporation, Tiller Russell, filed.(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Zoom login information for hearing set for 1/5/2022 at 9:00 a.m.: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1607347208?pwd=SWtMRi9zSmFocXhyR3hab0h0emhCdz09; Dial In: (669) 254-5252; Meeting ID: 160 734 7208; Passcode: 886176, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 110 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 1:30 p.m. is RESET to 1/5/2022 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
November 23, 2021 Zoom login information for hearing set for 11/30/2021 at 1:30 p.m.: Join ZoomGov meeting: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610156816?pwd=TWx5SFczNDE3eDlFWS9tSFJzYjMrQT09; Dial In: (669) 254-5252 / Meeting ID: 161 015 6816 / Passcode: 776492, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
November 17, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference RESET to 11/30/2021 at 01:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 108 Supplemental SEALED REPLY re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (unredacted version), #2 Exhibit 3 (unredacted version)) (Lutzky, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 107 Supplemental REPLY in Support of #38 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, filed by Intellectual Property Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4)(Lutzky, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Agreed #105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant's deadline to submit a response to Plaintiff's supplemental briefing, is EXTENDED to 11/7/2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 105 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal JurisdictionMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/17/2021. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 104 SEALED RESPONSE Supplemental re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by James Kuykendall, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter from Tiller to Kuykendall, #3 Exhibit 3 Letter from Kuykendall to Tiller, #4 Exhibit 4 Letter from O'Connor to Amazon, #5 Exhibit 5 Letter from O'Connor to Stracher, #6 Exhibit 6 Letter from Stracher to O'Connor, #7 Exhibit 7 letter from O'Connor to Stracher, #8 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Kuykendall, #9 Exhibit 9 Declaration of Hernandez, #10 Exhibit 10 Declaration of Chavarria, #11 Exhibit 11 IPC Responses, #12 Exhibit 12 Russell Responses, #13 Exhibit 13 Transcript of Russell Depo I, #14 Exhibit 14 Transcript of Russell Depo II, #15 Exhibit 15 Transcript of Berrellez Depo, #16 Exhibit 16 Transcript of Olymbiou Depo, #17 Exhibit 17 Transcript of Amazon Depo, #18 Exhibit 18 TR Executive Producer Agreement, #19 Exhibit 19 IPC PSA, #20 Exhibit 20 Participant Agreement, #21 Exhibit 21 AZ-JK109, #22 Exhibit 22 AZ-JK118-129, #23 Exhibit 23 AZ-JK176, #24 Exhibit 24 AZ-JK279, #25 Exhibit 25 AZ-JK310, #26 Exhibit 26 AZ-JK361, #27 Exhibit 27 AZ-JK511, #28 Exhibit 28 IPC058, #29 Exhibit 29 RUSSELL51, #30 Exhibit 30 AZ-JK193, #31 Exhibit 31 IPC053, #32 Exhibit 32 AZ-JK283) (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 103 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition to #38 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, filed by James Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter from Tiller to Kuykendall, #3 Exhibit 3 Letter from Kuykendall to Tiller, #4 Exhibit 4 Letter from O'Connor to Amazon, #5 Exhibit 5 Letter from O'Connor to Stracher, #6 Exhibit 6 Letter from Stracher to O'Connor, #7 Exhibit 7 letter from O'Connor to Stracher, #8 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Kuykendall, #9 Exhibit 9 Declaration of Hernandez, #10 Exhibit 10 Declaration of Chavarria, #11 Exhibit 11 IPC Responses, #12 Exhibit 12 Russell Responses, #13 Exhibit 13 Transcript of Russell Depo I, #14 Exhibit 14 Transcript of Russell Depo II, #15 Exhibit 15 Transcript of Berrellez Depo, #16 Exhibit 16 Transcript of Olymbiou Depo, #17 Exhibit 17 Transcript of Amazon Depo, #18 Exhibit 18 TR Executive Producer Agreement, #19 Exhibit 19 IPC PSA, #20 Exhibit 20 Participant Agreement, #21 Exhibit 21 AZ-JK109, #22 Exhibit 22 AZ-JK118-129, #23 Exhibit 23 AZ-JK176, #24 Exhibit 24 AZ-JK279, #25 Exhibit 25 AZ-JK310, #26 Exhibit 26 AZ-JK361, #27 Exhibit 27 AZ-JK511, #28 Exhibit 28 IPC058, #29 Exhibit 29 RUSSELL51, #30 Exhibit 30 AZ-JK193, #31 Exhibit 31 IPC053, #32 Exhibit 32 AZ-JK283)(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Good Pixel Productions, John Massaria by James Kuykendall, filed. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. The Court GRANTS attorney Megan E. McKenzie's Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as attorney of record for Plaintiff James Kuykendall. Attorney Megan E. McKenzie terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
October 18, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION for Megan E. McKenzie to Withdraw as AttorneyMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2021. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION for Carmel T. Kappus to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2021. (Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(DanyaGarza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER.The Court CLARIFIES that the jurisdictional discovery is limited to the two issues of: (1) the exact relationship between Dismissal Movants and Amazon and (2) Dismissal Movants' roles in planning and executing the distribution of the Show and as more fully outlined in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 96 OBJECTIONS to #95 Reply to Response to Motion [Plaintiff's 9/07/21 submission], filed by Intellectual Property Corporation. (Lutzky, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to #91 MOTION for Clarification as to #86 Order,, filed by James Kuykendall. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 6, 2021 Filing 94 RESPONSE to #91 MOTION for Clarification as to #86 Order, filed by Amazon Studios LLC. (Freeman, Cydney) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 6, 2021 Filing 93 RESPONSE to #86 Order, and Plaintiff's 09.01.2021 Letter #91 , filed by Intellectual Property Corporation. (Lutzky, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. The Court ORDERS Defendants to file a response, if any, to Plaintiff's motion #91 no later than 9/6/2021. Failure to respond will be construed as a statement of non-opposition. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 91 MOTION for Clarification as to #86 Order, Motions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Amanat, Farzin) Modified on 3/15/2022 (JessicaGRodriguez, 5). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 90 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Alexander B. Lutzky for Transcript of 8/19/2021 Status Conference held before Mag. Judge John Kazen. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions, filed. (Lutzky, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 89 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #88 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT re: hearing held on 8/19/21 before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext. Ordering Party F. Franklin Amanat Esq. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2021., filed. (VeritextLegalSolutions, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 87 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Protective Order, filed.(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. In order to allow Plaintiff to conduct meaningful discovery on the jurisdictional issued raised by the Dismissal Defendants, this Court enters this Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. The deadlines set forth in this Order shall not be modified except by leave of Court upon a showing of good cause and shall be binding on all parties. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 85 AO 435 /ACKNOWLEDGEMENT TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Franklin Amanat for Transcript of CIVIL HEARING, 8/19/2021,Judge John A Kazen. Expedited requested. ERO: Tanya Trevino / Audio and notes were forwarded to Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vertitext Legal Solutions (TanyaTrevino, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 84 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff/Amanat for Transcript of 08/19/2021 before Judge Kazan. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions, filed. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 19, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/19/2021. The Court addressed with counsel the issue of the scope and timing of jurisdictional discovery as referenced in the District Judge's recent Order, (Dkt. No. 80), including reviewing the Updated Joint Report submitted by the parties, (Dkt. No. 83). Plaintiff requests that jurisdictional discovery include written discovery and depositions, to be conducted up to the date of the hearing on the motion to dismiss. Defendants request that jurisdictional discovery be limited to written discovery to end by 9/8/2021, which is Plaintiff's deadline to file its supplemental briefing. The Court took the issue under advisement and will issue a written order. The Court will defer deciding the issue of setting additional scheduling order deadlines on general discovery until a subsequent status conference to be held after the end of the jurisdictional supplemental briefing schedule. Appearances by Zoom videoconference: F. Franklin Amanat and Megan E. McKenzie f/PLAINTIFF. Laura L. Prather, Gilberto Hinojosa and Diana Palacios f/DEFENDANT AMAZON STUDIOS, LLC. Cameron Stracher and Sara Tesoriero f/DEFENDANTS HECTOR BERRELLEZ, JOHN MASSARIA AND TILLER RUSSELL. Laura L. Prather and Wesley D. Lewis f/DEFENDANT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION. (Time in court: 9:07 - 10:14 a.m.) (ERO: Tanya Trevino), filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 83 Amended JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Intellectual Property Corporation, filed.(Lutzky, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference RESET to 8/19/2021 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 01:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER - Pending before the Court is Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #38 . Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit briefing by September 8, 2021. Defendants may respond by September 22, 2021. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen to set deadlines and establish parameters for any jurisdictional discovery. (Brief due by 9/8/2021) (Responses due by September 22, 2021). It is so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified. (mmarquez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Wesly D. Lewis' Unopposed #77 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Wesley Darwin Lewis terminated. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove Mr. Lewis as counsel for Defendant from the docket sheet. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 78 REPLY to #75 Response, to Notice of Correction, filed by James Kuykendall. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Wesley D. Lewis to Withdraw as AttorneyMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. Deadline for all Parties to serve Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures due by 6/7/2021; Deadline for Plaintiff and Defendant Amazon to serve initial written discovery due by 6/7/2021; Joinder of all Parties due by 9/30/2021; Status Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 09:00 AM by Zoom videoconference before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 21, 2021 Filing 75 RESPONSE to #62 Notice (Other), Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Correction to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Hector Berrellez, Intellectual Property Corporation, John Massaria, Tiller Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Tiller Russell)(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE : RULE 29 STIPULATION TO DEFER DISCOVERY AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS, by James Kuykendall, filed. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander B. Lutzky on behalf of Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. (Lutzky, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 72 REPLY in Support of #59 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California, Los Angeles Division, filed by Amazon Studios LLC. (Palacios, Diana) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. The Court OVERRULES Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Correction #63 and DENIES Defendants' request to strike the filing. In the alternative, Defendants request leave to file a response to Plaintiff's Notice of Correction to address how the revised factual information may affect the Court's analysis of the personal jurisdiction issues raised in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. No. 38). The Court deems this appropriate to receive additional briefing on this issue and GRANTS Defendants leave to file a response to Plaintiff's Notice of Correction. Defendants may file their response by 5/21/2021. Plaintiff may file a reply by 5/28/2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Sara C. Tesoriero to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 69 Certificate of Good Standing by Sara C. Tesoriero on behalf of Hector Berrellez, John Massaria, Tiller Russell, ( #67 Order) filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. Defendants are ORDERED to provide a certificate of good standing on behalf of Sara C. Tesoriero by 5/28/2021. Upon receipt of Ms. Tesoriero's certificate of good standing, the Court will issue a ruling on Defendant's #66 Motion for Sara C. Tesoriero to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. INITIAL PRETRIAL & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/11/2021. The Court reviewed the purpose of the hearing pursuant to FRCP 16(b) and (c), the factual background of the case, and the basis for jurisdiction. The Court inquired as to the status of settlement negotiations. The Court addressed Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Correction (Dkt. No. 63). The Court then turned to the proposed scheduling order in this case. The Defendants who have filed a motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 38) and motion to transfer venue (Dkt. No. 59) argued that discovery should be suspended pending a ruling on those motions. Those Defendants have entered into a Rule 29 agreement with Plaintiff regarding discovery. The Court ORDERED Plaintiff to file the Rule 29 agreement by 5/18/2021. Upon consideration of the Rule 29 agreement, the Court will enter an order setting further deadlines, including a status conference SET for 8/19/2021 at 9:00 a.m. The Court emphasized the importance of conferring before filing opposed motions and of providing the Court with prompt notification of settlement. The Court directed the parties to review the District Judge's court rules, available on the Court's website. A telephonic status conference was SET for 8/19/2021 at 9:00 a.m. A written scheduling order will follow. Appearances by Zoom videoconference: F. Franklin Amanat and Megan E. McKenzie f/PLAINTIFF. Laura L. Prather, Gilberto Hinojosa and Diana Palacios f/DEFENDANT AMAZON STUDIOS, LLC. Cameron Stracher and Sara Tesoriero f/DEFENDANTS HECTOR BERRELLEZ, JOHN MASSARIA AND TILLER RUSSELL. Laura L. Prather and Wesley D. Lewis f/DEFENDANT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION. (Time in court: 3:38 - 4:50 p.m.) (ERO: Ben Mendoza), filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION for Sara C. Tesoriero to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Hector Berrellez, John Massaria, Tiller Russell, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/11/2021 at 03:30 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguezadi, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition to #59 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California, Los Angeles Division, filed by James Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Franklin Amanat, #2 Exhibit A to Amanat Declaration (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures), #3 Exhibit B to Amanat Declaration (Amazon Initial Disclosures), #4 Exhibit C to Amanat Declaration (IPC Defendants' Initial Disclosures))(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 63 OBJECTIONS Letter Objection to Notice of Correction, see Dkt. 62, filed by Hector Berrellez, Intellectual Property Corporation, John Massaria, Tiller Russell. (Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re: #53 Response in Opposition to Motion, by James Kuykendall, filed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pedro T. Hernandez, #2 Exhibit A to Hernandez Declaration, #3 Declaration of Michael Chavarria, #4 Exhibit A to Chavarria Declaration)(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 29, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/11/2021 at 11:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguezadi, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 60 REPLY in Support of #38 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, filed by Intellectual Property Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Declaration of Andy Olymbiou, #2 Exhibit 2 - Corrected Declaration of Andy Olymbiou, #3 Exhibit 3 - Corrected Declaration of Tiller Russell)(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California, Los Angeles Division by Amazon Studios LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Affidavit of Chris Castallo, #3 Proposed Order)(Palacios, Diana) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 58 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by James Kuykendall, filed.(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Alonzo Wickers IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Diana Palacios to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Cydney Swofford Freeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Change of Address by F. Franklin Amanat, Greg G. Gutzler and Megan E. McKenzie, counsel for James Kuykendall, filed. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition to #38 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, filed by James Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James H. Kuykendall)(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 52 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amazon Studios LLC, filed.(Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 51 First MOTION for Alonzo Wickers IV to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Amazon Studios LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2021. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 50 First MOTION for Dianna Palacios to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Amazon Studios LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2021. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 49 First MOTION for Cydney Swofford Freeman to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Amazon Studios LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2021. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference RESET to 5/13/2021 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 47 MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Amazon Studios LLC, Hector Berrellez, filed.(Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint #45 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff's deadline to file a response to the pending motion to dismiss is EXTENDED to 4/8/2021. Defendants' deadline to file any reply is EXTENDED to 4/22/2021. The Court also finds good cause to RESET the initial pretrial and scheduling conference to 4/13/2021 at 11:00 a.m. by Zoom videoconference before Judge John A. Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) Modified on 3/30/2021 (JessicaGRodriguez, 5). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 30, 2021 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference RESET to 4/13/2021 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff to File Response to Motion to Dismiss and Defendant to File Reply Brief and Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling ConferenceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference)(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE AND DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2021 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting #36 Motion for Cameron Stracher to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(mmarquez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 42 DUPLICATE ENTRY AS DKT. #36 . *** MOTION for Law Offices of Cameron Stracher, to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions referred to John A Kazen. by Hector Berrellez, John Massaria, Tiller Russell, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2021. (mmarquez, 5) Modified on 3/9/2021 (mmarquez, 5). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Intellectual Property Corporation, filed.(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon Studios LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Amazon Studios LLC, filed.(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue)(Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Stracher on behalf of Hector Berrellez, John Massaria, Tiller Russell, filed. (mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Cameron Stracher to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Hector Berrellez, John Massaria, Tiller Russell, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley D. Lewis on behalf of Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. (Lewis, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Lee Prather on behalf of Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. (Prather, Laura) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilberto Hinojosa also listed as Co-Counsel for Amazon Studios, LLC, Hector Berrellez, and Intellecutal Property on behalf of Tiller Russell, filed. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilberto Hinojosa on behalf of Intellectual Property Corporation, filed. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilberto Hinojosa on behalf of Amazon Studios LLC, Hector Berrellez, filed. (Hinojosa, Gilberto) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Good Pixel Productions served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John Massaria served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 25, 2021 Summons Re-Issued as to Good Pixel Productions, John Massaria. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(FernandoVilla, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Amazon Studios LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tiller Russell served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Intellectual Property Corporation served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hector Berrellez served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 DESIGNATION of F. Franklin Amanat as attorney in charge of James Kuykendall, filed.(Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Franklin Amanat on behalf of James Kuykendall, filed. (Amanat, Farzin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Tiller Russell sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to John Massaria sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Intellectual Property Corporation sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Good Pixel Productions sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Hector Berrellez sent on 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Amazon Studios LLC sent on Corrected Date: 01/05/2021 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Amazon Studios LLC sent on 01/05/20 by James Kuykendall, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to Amazon Studios LLC, Hector Berrellez, Good Pixel Productions, Intellectual Property Corporation, John Massaria, Tiller Russell. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dmorales, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 2, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazon Studios LLC, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 2, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tiller Russell, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 2, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Issuance of Summons as to John Massaria, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 2, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Intellectual Property Corporation, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 2, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Good Pixel Productions, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
January 2, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hector Berrellez, filed.(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Megan E. McKenzie to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Greg G. Gutzler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Bruce D. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for F. Franklin Amanat to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(bmendoza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Bruce D. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Megan E. McKenzie to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Greg G. Gutzler to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Franklin Amanat to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by James Kuykendall, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25702505) filed by James Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Alex) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/23/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Kuykendall v. Amazon Studios LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kuykendall
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Bruce D Bernstein
Represented By: Carmel T. Kappus
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Megan E McKenzie
Represented By: Saul Cohen
Represented By: Alex J. Brown
Represented By: F. Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: Michael A. Akselrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Represented By: Alonzo B Wickers, IV
Represented By: Cristina M Salvato
Represented By: Cydney Swofford Freeman
Represented By: Diana Palacios
Represented By: Gilberto Hinojosa
Represented By: Joel Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Berrellez
Represented By: Cameron A Stracher
Represented By: Gilberto Hinojosa
Represented By: Sara C. Tesoriero
Represented By: Cameron A. Stracher
Represented By: Jason T. Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Massaria
Represented By: Cameron A Stracher
Represented By: Sara C. Tesoriero
Represented By: Cameron A. Stracher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Pixel Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiller Russell
Represented By: Cameron A Stracher
Represented By: Gilberto Hinojosa
Represented By: Sara C. Tesoriero
Represented By: Cameron A. Stracher
Represented By: Jason T. Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intellectual Property Corporation
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Represented By: Alexander B. Lutzky
Represented By: Gilberto Hinojosa
Represented By: Wesley Darwin Lewis
Represented By: Jason T. Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?