Kyle Fitzpatrick v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Fitzpatrick
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv01924
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
2 Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Kyle Fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 12, 2023 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joy Moiselle De Leon counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Joy de Leon as counsel of record for Kyle Fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (De Leon, Joy)
July 12, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #55 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re party name. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 12, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 11, 2023 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Filed by plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
July 10, 2023 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joy Moiselle De Leon counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Joy de Leon as counsel of record for Kyle Fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attorney Joy Moiselle De Leon added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(De Leon, Joy)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTES ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #42 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Motion is DENIED. Defendant is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (See document for further information). (jp)
June 23, 2023 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Elizabeth Larocque as counsel of record for Kyle Fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2023 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mani Arabi counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Mani Arabi as counsel of record for kyle fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff plaintiff. (Attorney Mani Arabi added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Arabi, Mani)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Re Renewed Stipulation to Continue Deadlines Set in Scheduling Order #49 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court ORDERS the court's 9/9/2022, Scheduling Order #33 MODIFIED to read as follows (with changes indicated by italics): Jury Trial se t for 1/16/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 12/14/2023 at 8:30 AM. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 7/14/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 9/15/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 9/8/2023. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 12/12/2023. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 12/19/2023. (See document for further information). (jp)
June 9, 2023 Filing 49 Renewed STIPULATION to Continue Deadlines Set In Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kolding, Shane)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Having reviewed and considered the parties Stipulation to Continue Deadlines Set in Scheduling Order (Dkt. #47 ) (Stipulation), as well as the files, records, and docket in this matter, and the applicable law, including Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4), In re W. States Wholesale Nat. Gas Antitrust Litig., 715 F.3d 716, 737 (9th Cir. 2013), and Johnson v. Mammoth Recreations, Inc., 975 F.2d 604, 609 (9th Cir. 1992), the court finds the Stipulation does not set forth sufficient good cause for the court to grant the relief and dates requested. In the Stipulation, the parties state, The parties have been unable to find mutually agreeable dates to take each others deposition, which has interfered with productive settlement discussions, and The parties therefore stipulate that good cause exists for the Court to extend the presently set dates from the Courts Scheduling Order. (Dkt. #47 at 2.) The court finds the Stipulation fails to provide specific details that demonstrate good cause to support the requested continuance of the applicable dates/deadlines in the courts Scheduling Order entered on September 9, 2022 (Dkt. #33 ) (the Scheduling Order). For example, the Stipulation fails to provide sufficient information regarding the specifics of how counsel or counsels have been diligent during the history of the case as to their efforts with fact discovery and/or expert discovery and scheduling of depositions such that good cause supports a continuance of the requested dates in the Scheduling Order. Therefore, because the Stipulation does not set forth sufficient good cause for the court to grant the relief and dates/deadlines requested, the Stipulation is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 28, 2023 Filing 47 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadlines Set In Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kolding, Shane)
March 20, 2023 Filing 46 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #42 . The court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for March 23, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 9, 2023 Filing 45 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) #42 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Kolding, Shane)
March 2, 2023 Filing 44 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) #42 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (ODI Response Letter), #2 Exhibit 2 (Appendix Search Criteria))(Law, Daniel)
March 2, 2023 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) #42 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration (warranty))(Law, Daniel)
February 17, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismissal Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Kolding, Shane)
January 23, 2023 Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #37 , filed by plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Dolin, Tionna)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint and Response Thereto #39 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter the following: (1) Plaintiff may have up to and including 1/23/2023, to file a Second Amended Complaint in the above-captioned action; and (2) Defendant shall have up to and including 2/20/2023, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint in the above-captioned action. (jp)
January 9, 2023 Filing 39 STIPULATION for Order to File Second Amended Complaint and Responses Thereto filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shane Bays Kolding added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Kolding, Shane)
December 23, 2022 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Kyle Fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
December 15, 2022 Filing 37 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Kyle Fitzpatrick amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Steven Whang added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #20 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Motion is GRANTED. The court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO AMEND Claims One through Five of the Complaint. Should Plaintiff desire to file an amended complaint that addresses the issues in this ruling, Plaintiff must file and serve it within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order. (See document for further information). (jp)
September 23, 2022 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 8 and 12(b)(6) #20 Supplemental Authority in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Maclear, Amy)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 11/7/2023 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 10/19/2023 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 11/10/2022. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 5/1/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 8/3/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 3/3/2023. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 9/28/2023. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 10/5/2023. (See document for further information). (jp)
September 8, 2022 Filing 32 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Patricia Maclear counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Adding Amy Maclear as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy)
July 13, 2022 Filing 30 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the Court is Defendants Motion to Dismiss #20 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for July 14, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
June 22, 2022 Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint #20 currently set for June 30, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. to July 14, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case DECLINED by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-ML-02814-AB-PVCx. (aco)
June 16, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 8 and 12(b)(6) #20 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Salas, Rodrigo)
June 14, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 9, 2022 Filing 23 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 8 and 12(b)(6) #20 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Alsaadi, Nadine)
June 9, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nadine Alsaadi counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Nadine Alsaadi as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attorney Nadine Alsaadi added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Alsaadi, Nadine)
May 27, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation; Evercore Trust Company, N.A.; Black Rock, Inc.; The Vanguard Group. (Salas, Rodrigo)
May 27, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 8 and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/30/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rodrigo Salas, #3 Proposed Order) (Salas, Rodrigo)
May 13, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE Of Dismissal of 6th Cause of Action (Fraud) filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Law, Daniel)
May 13, 2022 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #15 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Law, Daniel)
May 13, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Kyle Fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time for Ford Motor Company to Respond to Complaint #14 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter that Ford Motor Company has up to and including 5/27/2022 to file a response to the initial complaint. (jp)
May 12, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Related Case(s): 2:18-ml-2814-AB-PVCx (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Salas, Rodrigo)
May 12, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 27, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Kyle Fitzpatrick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-066) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01924-FWS-JPRx. (rn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 5/13/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Nassihi, Amir)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick, upon Defendant Does served on 3/25/2022, answer due 4/15/2022; Ford Motor Company served on 3/25/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (ghap)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33003156 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kyle Fitzpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Ford Car Light Truck Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Kyle Fitzpatrick(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle Fitzpatrick v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Nadine Alsaadi
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Mani Arabi
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Joy Moiselle De Leon
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Rodrigo E Salas
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear
Represented By: Shane Bays Kolding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?